EP2151481 - Aqueous solution and method for coating metallic surfaces and use of modified silicic acids and concentrate compound for preparing an aqueous coating solution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chemische Werke Kluthe GmbH Gottlieb-Daimler-Strasse 12 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2010/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doms, Gabriele Verschaffeltstrasse 34 68167 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Distler, Tobias Goethestrasse 22 69214 Eppelheim / DE | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Carsten BEYER.PRO Patent Kaiserring 48 68161 Mannheim / DE | [2013/23] |
Former [2012/33] | Göpfert, Wolfgang, et al MAS&P Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Kaiserring 48-50 DE-68161 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/27] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2010/06] | Ullrich & Naumann Luisenstrasse 14 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09009425.1 | 21.07.2009 | [2010/06] | Priority number, date | DE20081035876 | 01.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008035876 | [2010/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2151481 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09D1/00, C09D5/08, C09D7/12, C23C22/34 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
C09D5/08 (EP,US);
C09D1/00 (EP);
C09D7/62 (EP,US);
C23C22/34 (EP);
C23C22/44 (EP);
C08K3/36 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wässrige Lösung und Verfahren zur Beschichtung von metallischen Oberflächen sowie Verwendung von modifizierter Kieselsäure bzw. Konzentratzusammensetzung zur Bereitstellung einer wässrigen Beschichtungslösung | [2010/06] | English: | Aqueous solution and method for coating metallic surfaces and use of modified silicic acids and concentrate compound for preparing an aqueous coating solution | [2010/06] | French: | Solution aqueuse et procédé de revêtement de surfaces métalliques et utilisation d'acide silique modifié ou de composition de concentré pour la préparation d'une solution de revêtement aqueuse | [2010/06] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 14.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/39] | 24.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0231065 (CHEMETALL GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 15, line 3 - line 10 * * examples 2, 3, 6-9, 13, 14, 15 * * tables 1, 2 *; | [XI]US2003157344 (SHOUP ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-7,12 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 17] , [0 29] , [0 36] - [0049] * * paragraphs [0056] , [0 64] * * examples 1-15 * * claims 2, 12 * [I] 11,13; | [XI]US2006134339 (WANG SHENGXIAN [CN], et al) [X] 1-7,12-13 * paragraphs [0045] - [0049] * * table 1 * * examples 1, 2, 4,5 * * figures 2A, 3 * * claims 13, 15, 16, 18, 22 * [I] 11; | [XP]EP1978055 (EADS EUROP AERONAUTIC DEFENCE [FR], et al) [XP] 1-3,7,12 * examples 1, 2 ** paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0053] *; | [XP]WO2008128932 (AKZO NOBEL COATINGS INT BV [NL], et al) [XP] 1-4,7,11-13,15 * page 7, line 25 - page 11, line 2 * * page 15, line 24 - line 29 * * claim 1 *; | [XI]EP1554221 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-7,12-13 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 13] , [0 16] , [0 20] - [0022] - [0 31] , [0 32] , [0 36] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0044] * * claims 1-3, 8 * [I] 11 | Examination | JP2007177314 |