EP2278080 - Hand-held drain clearing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XIA, Hong Room 1501, No. 27, Lane 259 Tiang Deng Road, Xu Hui District Shanghai / CN | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Tergau & Walkenhorst Intellectual Property GmbH Lurgiallee 12 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Hafner-Tergau-Walkenhorst Eschersheimer Landstrasse 105-107 60322 Frankfurt/Main / DE | ||
Former [2011/04] | Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Eschersheimer Landstrasse 105-107 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 09009483.0 | 22.07.2009 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2278080 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/308, B08B9/032 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
E03C1/308 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Manuelle Vorrichtung zur Abflussreinigung | [2011/04] | English: | Hand-held drain clearing device | [2011/04] | French: | Dispositif manuel de débouchement d'évacuation | [2011/04] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 31.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/18] | 18.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1059392 (OTTO S R L [IT]) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0012] - [0030] - [0037] - [0041] * * figure - *; | [X]DE252429 (KRÜGER, EDMUND) [X] 1,2 * page 1, lines 17-31 * * figure . *; | [XA]US5239708 (IRWIN LAWRENCE F [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 1-41 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 24 * * figures 5-7 * [A] 2-4,6,7; | [A]US6393625 (TSAI JOHN [TW]) [A] 6 * column 2, lines 30-40 * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2707000 (PEEPS DONALD J) [A] 1,8 * column 2, lines 60-74 * * figure . * | by applicant | US7350265 |