EP2191717 - Acetate-containing mating disruptant and mating distruption method using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/20] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Kinya c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hojo, Tatsuya c/o Specialty Chemicals Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 03 /
Fukumoto, Takehiko c/o Specialty Chemicals Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | [2016/20] |
Former [2010/22] | 01 /
Ogawa, Kinya c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Hojo, Tatsuya c/o Specialty Chemicals Research Center, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Fukumoto, Takehiko c/o Specialty Chemicals Research Center, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi-Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Wolff, Felix, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/20] | Wolff, Felix, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2010/22] | Wolff, Felix, et al Kutzenberger & Wolff Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 09009617.3 | 24.07.2009 | [2010/22] | Priority number, date | JP20080190700 | 24.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008190700 | [2010/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2191717 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2191717 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2191717 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N31/02, A01N37/02, A01N37/06, A01P19/00 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
A01N31/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N31/02, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N31/02, A01N37/02, A01N37/06 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] |
Former [2010/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Acetathaltige Verwirrmethode und Verwirrmethodenverfahren damit | [2010/22] | English: | Acetate-containing mating disruptant and mating distruption method using the same | [2010/22] | French: | Perturbation d'accouplement contenant de l'acétate et procédé de perturbation d'accouplement l'utilisant | [2010/22] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 09.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15159654.1 / EP2932845 | EP15159657.4 / EP2932846 | EP15159659.0 / EP2932847 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.07.2009 | BE | 18.05.2016 | BG | 18.05.2016 | CY | 18.05.2016 | CZ | 18.05.2016 | DK | 18.05.2016 | EE | 18.05.2016 | FI | 18.05.2016 | HR | 18.05.2016 | IS | 18.05.2016 | LT | 18.05.2016 | LV | 18.05.2016 | MC | 18.05.2016 | MK | 18.05.2016 | NL | 18.05.2016 | PL | 18.05.2016 | RO | 18.05.2016 | SE | 18.05.2016 | SI | 18.05.2016 | SK | 18.05.2016 | SM | 18.05.2016 | IE | 24.07.2016 | LU | 24.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | NO | 18.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 24.07.2009 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
IE | 24.07.2016 | ||
LU | 24.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 24.07.2009 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
IS | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
IE | 24.07.2016 | ||
LU | 24.07.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 24.07.2009 | |
BE | 18.05.2016 | ||
CY | 18.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
MK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
IE | 24.07.2016 | ||
LU | 24.07.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | BE | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SI | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
IE | 24.07.2016 | ||
LU | 24.07.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | BE | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
MC | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | BE | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
SM | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 18.05.2016 | |
CZ | 18.05.2016 | ||
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
PL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
SK | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 18.05.2016 | |
DK | 18.05.2016 | ||
EE | 18.05.2016 | ||
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
RO | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 18.05.2016 | |
FI | 18.05.2016 | ||
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
SE | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
HR | 18.05.2016 | ||
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
LV | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 18.05.2016 | |
LT | 18.05.2016 | ||
NL | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 18.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 18.05.2016 | |
NO | 18.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1457112 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,8 * examples 1,2 * * claim 1 * [I] 1-8; | [XI]US4575458 (STECK WARREN F [CA], et al) [X] 1,8 * claims 1,2 * * tables 1-4,4A,5-7 * [I] 1-8; | [XI]EP1459626 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,8 * example 1 * [I] 1-8; | [XI]FR2581507 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,8 * claims 1-3 * * tables 1-2 * [I] 1-8; | [XI]US5532273 (OGAWA KINYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * claims 1,3 * * tables 1,2 * [I] 1-8; | [XDI]JPS63246301 ; | [XDI]JPS62212305 ; | [XI]WO2008063119 (FORSKARPATENT I SYD AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,8 * claims 5-7 * * page 17, paragraph l - page 18, paragraph 1 * * page 12, paragraph l * [I] 1-8; | [XI]EP1652430 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,8 * example 1 * [I] 1-8; | [XI]WO2007053926 (HART MELANIE [CA], et al) [X] 1,8 * examples 3,4 * [I] 1-8; | [XI]US2006057177 (HOJO TATSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0054] - [0057] * [I] 1-8 | [XDI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 47, Database accession no. 1988-333816, XP002694099 & JPS63246301 A 19881013 (SHINETSU CHEM IND CO LTD) [XD] 1,8 * abstract * * example Examples * [I] 1-8 | [XDI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 43, Database accession no. 1987-302818, XP002694100 & JPS62212305 A 19870918 (SHINETSU CHEM IND CO LTD) [XD] 1,8 * abstract * * Examples * [I] 1-8 | Examination | - HONGYI WEI, YONGPING HUANG, JIAWEI DU, "SEX PHEROMONES AND REPRODUCTIVE BEHAVIOR OF SPODOPTERA LITURA(FABRICIUS) MOTHS REARED FROM LARVAE TREATED WITH FOUR INSECTICIDES", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL ECOLOGY, (20040101), pages 1457 - 1466, URL: http://download.springer.com/static/pdf/723/art%3A10.1023%2FB%3AJOEC.0000037751.86203.10.pdf?auth66=1364985791_8fdebcca9cfbabf20ae57f855ad63ffd&ext=.pdf, (20130319), XP055057051 | - W L ROELOFS, AND R L BROWN, "PHEROMONES AND EVOLUTIONARY RELATIONSHIPS OF TORTRICIDAE", ANNUAL REVIEW OF ECOLOGY AND SYSTEMATICS, vol. 13, (20130319), pages 395 - 422, URL: http://www.annualreviews.org/doi/pdf/10.1146/annurev.es.13.110182.002143, (20130319), XP055057050 | by applicant | JPS6324630 | JPS63246301 |