EP2287820 - An apparatus and method operative for providing traffic information on a traffic area [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Duisburg-Essen Universitätsstrasse 2 45141 Essen / DE | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jung, Peter Siegstrasse 27 47051 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
Bruck, Guido Poststrasse 87 46562 Voerde / DE | 03 /
Waadt, Andreas Sternbuschweg 324 47057 Duisburg / DE | 04 /
Wang, Shangbo Duisburger Strasse 428 45478 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09009831.0 | 29.07.2009 | [2011/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2287820 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/01 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
G08G1/0104 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Betriebsvorrichtung und -verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Verkehrsinformationen in einem Verkehrsbereich | [2011/08] | English: | An apparatus and method operative for providing traffic information on a traffic area | [2011/08] | French: | Appareil et procédé opératif pour fournir des informations de trafic sur une zone de trafic | [2011/08] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/39] | 24.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 09.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2003014181 (MYR DAVID [IL]) [X] 1-2,4-6,8,10-12,14-15 * page 2, paragraphs 26,27,36,38-41 * * page 3, paragraph 69 * * page 4, paragraph 98 * * page 5, paragraph 117 * * page 10, paragraphs 238,239,246 * * page 11, paragraphs 250,251 * * page 12, paragraph 274 * [Y] 10 [I] 3; | [XY]US7228224 (ROSEN KENNETH H [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11-15 * column 1, lines 45-58 * * column 2, lines 31-65 * * column 3, lines 4-42 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 20 * [Y] 7,9; | [Y]US2008255754 (PINTO DAVID [US]) [Y] 7,9-10 * page 2, paragraph 33 * * page 8, paragraphs 176-178 *; | [AD] - JOBMANN K ET AL, "Location Management in Cellular Networks: Classification of the Most Important Paradigms, Realistic Simulation Framework, and Relative Performance Analysis", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20050301), vol. 54, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 687 - 708, XP011129079 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TVT.2004.842459 | Examination | WO9934611 | EP1296531 | US2004230373 | WO2009080105 | by applicant | - MONAHAN T, """War Rooms" of the Street: Surveillance Practices in Transportation Control Centers", THE COMMUNICATION REVIEW, (2007), vol. 10, pages 367 - 389 | - SCHNEIDER W; MRAKOTSKY E, "Mobile phones as a basis for traffic state information", IEEE CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, (200509), pages 782 - 784 | - DRANE C; MACNAUGHTAN M; SCOTT C, "Positioning GSM telephones", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, (199804), vol. 36, no. 4, pages 46 - 59 | - KYAMMAKA K; JOBMANN K, "Location management in cellular networks: classification of the most important paradigms, realistic simulation framework, and relative performance analysis", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 54, pages 687 - 708 | - PATTARA-ATIKOM W; PEACHAVANISH R; LUCKANA R, "Estimating Road Traffic Congestion using Cell Dwell Time with Simple Threshold and Fuzzy Logic Techniques", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2007 IEEE INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS CONFERENCE, (2007), pages 956 - 961 | - JUAN C. HERRERA; ALEXANDRE M. BAYEN, "Eulerian versus Lagrangian Sensing in Traffic State Estimation", UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, BERKELY |