EP2133371 - Coatingforming anti-corrosion agent with good adhesion and process for its non-electric application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/51] | Anti-corrosion agent comprising a varnish coating with good adhesion and method for electricity-free application of the same | ||
[2009/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings GmbH Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2010/16] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dornbusch, Michael Hebbelweg 4 58513 Lüdenscheid / DE | 02 /
Austrup, Elke Schmandpott 4 59334 Nordkirchen / DE | 03 /
Hintze-Brüning, Horst Thomas-Mann-Weg 9 48165 Münster / DE | [2010/07] |
Former [2009/51] | 01 /
Dornbusch, Michael Gustav-Tweer-Weg 24 48167 Münster / DE | ||
02 /
Austrup, Elke Schmandpott 4 59334 Nordkirchen / DE | |||
03 /
Hintze-Brüning, Horst Thomas-Mann-Weg 9 48165 Münster / DE | Representative(s) | Steffan & Kiehne Patentanwälte PartG mbB Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte Postfach 10 40 09 40031 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09009845.0 | 19.09.2007 | [2009/51] | Priority number, date | DE20061053291 | 13.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006053291 | [2009/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2133371 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2133371 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/18, C09D5/08 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
C09D5/088 (EP,US);
C09D5/08 (KR);
C08F220/18 (KR);
C09D133/06 (KR);
C09D133/26 (KR);
C08F220/26 (EP,US);
C08F220/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | Lackschichtbildendes Korrosionsschutzmittel mit guter Haftung und Verfahren zu dessen stromfreier Applikation | [2009/51] | English: | Coatingforming anti-corrosion agent with good adhesion and process for its non-electric application | [2009/52] | French: | Agent anti-corrosion formant une couche avec bonne adhérence et son application sans courant électrique | [2009/52] |
Former [2009/51] | Anti-corrosion agent comprising a varnish coating with good adhesion and method for electricity-free application of the same | ||
Former [2009/51] | Agent anticorrosion formant une couche de vernis ayant une bonne adhérence et procédé pour son application sans courant | Examination procedure | 16.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 23.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07818234.2 / EP2091980 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070818234) is 01.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.09.2011 | CZ | 14.09.2011 | DK | 14.09.2011 | EE | 14.09.2011 | FI | 14.09.2011 | HU | 14.09.2011 | IE | 14.09.2011 | IT | 14.09.2011 | LT | 14.09.2011 | LV | 14.09.2011 | MT | 14.09.2011 | NL | 14.09.2011 | PL | 14.09.2011 | RO | 14.09.2011 | SE | 14.09.2011 | SI | 14.09.2011 | SK | 14.09.2011 | TR | 14.09.2011 | LU | 19.09.2011 | BE | 30.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | FR | 14.11.2011 | BG | 14.12.2011 | GB | 14.12.2011 | GR | 15.12.2011 | ES | 25.12.2011 | IS | 14.01.2012 | PT | 16.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
LU | 19.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 14.11.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
GB | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
LU | 19.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 14.11.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
GB | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
LU | 19.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 14.11.2011 | ||
GB | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 14.11.2011 | ||
GB | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/19] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 14.11.2011 | ||
GB | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
MT | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GB | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GB | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
IT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
IE | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 14.09.2011 | |
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5567761 (SONG ZHIQIANG [US]) [X] 1-2,4-7 * example 61 * [Y] 3,8; | [Y]EP1217094 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 8* claim 5 *; | [Y]DE10126651 (BASF COATINGS AG [DE]) [Y] 3 * example 1 * | by applicant | DE3727382 | EP0534120 | US5221371 | WO9610461 | WO9929927 | DE19858708 | WO0146296 | WO0186016 | EP1217094 | DE10206983 | DE10256226 | DE10330413 |