EP2151349 - Mobile power set [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DISSERTORI S.A.S Via Brennero 15 39044 Egna (BZ) / IT | [2010/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dissertori, Martin Via Brennero 15 39044 Egna (Bolzano) / IT | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Maroscia, Antonio Maroscia & Associati Srl Viale Roma, 3 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | Maroscia, Antonio Contrà Porti, 21 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [2010/06] | Pajola, Stefano Maroscia & Associati Srl Contrà Porti, 21 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 09009990.4 | 03.08.2009 | [2010/06] | Priority number, date | IT2008PD00241 | 04.08.2008 Original published format: IT PD20080241 | [2010/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2151349 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60P3/14, H02K7/18, H02K9/04 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
B60P3/14 (EP);
H02K7/1815 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mobiler Stromerzeuger | [2010/06] | English: | Mobile power set | [2010/06] | French: | Générateur mobile | [2010/06] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 31.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/33] | 27.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2220650 (HERZOG ROBERT P) [A] 1-4,8,9 * page 1, column 2, line 6 - line 16 * * page 2, column 2, line 32 - line 36 * * page 3, column 1, line 41 - line 46; figure 2 *; | [A]CA964892 (FREIENTHAL VILLEM) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 6 - page 8, line 15; figures 2,3 *; | [A]GB2299559 (AICHI SANGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 2 - page 5, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2003274604 (ASAHI ELECTRONICS) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | CN1094198 |