EP2157415 - Microscopy imaging system and method employing stimulated Raman spectroscopy as a contrast mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states President and Fellows of Harvard College 17 Quincy Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2015/31] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states President and Fellows of Harvard College 17 Quincy Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Xie, Xiaoliang Sunney 135 Grant Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 02 /
Freudiger, Christian 141 Charles Street No. 5 Boston, MA 02114 / US | 03 /
Min, Wei 540 Memorial Drive, Apt. 204 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2010/08] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/08] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09010121.3 | 05.08.2009 | [2010/08] | Priority number, date | US20080196746 | 22.08.2008 Original published format: US 196746 | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2157415 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2157415 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/44, G01N21/65 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
G01J3/44 (EP,US);
G01N21/65 (EP,US);
G01N2021/653 (EP,US);
G01N2021/655 (EP,US);
G01N2021/656 (EP,US);
G01N2201/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2010/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Mikroskopie-Bildgebungssystem und Verfahren, das stimulierte Raman-Spektroskopie als einen Kontrastmechanismus einsetzt | [2010/08] | English: | Microscopy imaging system and method employing stimulated Raman spectroscopy as a contrast mechanism | [2010/08] | French: | Système d'imagerie de microscopie et procédé employant une spectroscopie de Raman stimulée en tant que mécanisme de contraste | [2010/08] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 03.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.01.2015 | 20.01.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2009 | AT | 29.07.2015 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | CZ | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | ES | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | HR | 29.07.2015 | IT | 29.07.2015 | LT | 29.07.2015 | LV | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | MK | 29.07.2015 | MT | 29.07.2015 | NL | 29.07.2015 | PL | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | SM | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | IE | 05.08.2015 | LU | 05.08.2015 | BE | 31.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | NO | 29.10.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | IS | 29.11.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 05.08.2009 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 05.08.2015 | ||
LU | 05.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 05.08.2009 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 05.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
IE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 29.07.2015 | |
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 29.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY] - PLOETZ E ET AL, "Femtosecond stimulated Raman microscopy", APPLIED PHYSICS B ; LASERS AND OPTICS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20070412), vol. 87, no. 3, ISSN 1432-0649, pages 389 - 393, XP019515599 [DY] 1-23 * page 390 - page 392; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00340-007-2630-x | [Y] - ANDREAS VOLKMER, "Vibrational imaging and microspectroscopies based on coherent anti-Stokes Raman scattering (CARS)", FRISNO-8, Ein Bokek, URL: http://www.weizmann.ac.il/conferences/frisno8/presentations05/monday/Volkmer.pdf, (20050225), XP002561572 [Y] 1-23 * pages 23-25 * | [Y] - SAIKAN S ET AL, "Inverse Raman spectroscopy in dye solutions with synchronized cw picosecond lasers", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 51, no. 6, ISSN 0030-4018, (19841015), pages 420 - 424, (19841015), XP024537303 [Y] 1-23 * pages 420-421; figure 1 * * page 423 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0030-4018(84)90130-5 | [Y] - GANIKHANOV F ET AL, "High-sensitivity vibrational imaging with frequency modulation coherent anti-Stokes Raman scattering (FM CARS) microscopy", Optics Letters Opt. Soc. America USA, (20060615), vol. 31, no. 12, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 1872 - 1874, XP002561573 [Y] 1-23 * page 1873; figure 1c * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.31.001872 | Examination | - EXTER M V ET AL, "Observation of the phase of a Raman oscillation", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 70, no. 5, doi:10.1016/0030-4018(89)90146-6, ISSN 0030-4018, (19890401), pages 433 - 438, (19890401), XP024476891 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0030-4018(89)90146-6 | - VAN EXTER M ET AL, "What is measured in a time-resolved stimulated Raman experiment?", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 56, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0030-4018(85)90115-4, ISSN 0030-4018, (19851201), pages 191 - 196, (19851201), XP024444928 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0030-4018(85)90115-4 | - B. LEVINE ET AL, "Ultrahigh sensitivity stimulated Raman gain spectroscopy", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, (19800101), vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1109/JQE.1980.1070342, ISSN 0018-9197, pages 85 - 89, XP055113513 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JQE.1980.1070342 | - T.R. CORLE, G.S. KINO, Confocal scanning optical microscopy and related imaging systems, SAN DIEGO, ACADEMIC PRESS, ISBN 0-12-408750-7 | - PLOETZ E ET AL, "Femtosecond stimulated Raman microscopy", APPLIED PHYSICS B ; LASERS AND OPTICS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20070412), vol. 87, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S00340-007-2630-X, ISSN 1432-0649, pages 389 - 393, XP019515599 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00340-007-2630-x | by applicant | US6798507 | US6809814 | US2008037595 | US7352458 | US7414729 |