EP2151301 - Beam device for irradiating surfaces to be treated [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buse Gastek GmbH & Co. KG Sprudelstrasse 3 53557 Bad Hönningen / DE | [2010/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ortiz, José Delmondstrasse 57 56598 Rheinbrohl / DE | [2010/06] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09010188.2 | 06.08.2009 | [2010/06] | Priority number, date | DE20081036331 | 06.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008036331 | [2010/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2151301 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2151301 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B24C1/00 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
B24C1/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/06] | Title | German: | Strahleinrichtung zum Bestrahlen von zu behandelnden Oberflächen | [2010/06] | English: | Beam device for irradiating surfaces to be treated | [2010/06] | French: | Dispositif de rayonnement destiné au rayonnement de surfaces devant être traitées | [2010/06] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 13.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.01.2011 | CZ | 19.01.2011 | DK | 19.01.2011 | EE | 19.01.2011 | FI | 19.01.2011 | HR | 19.01.2011 | HU | 19.01.2011 | IE | 19.01.2011 | IT | 19.01.2011 | LT | 19.01.2011 | LV | 19.01.2011 | MK | 19.01.2011 | MT | 19.01.2011 | NL | 19.01.2011 | PL | 19.01.2011 | RO | 19.01.2011 | SE | 19.01.2011 | SI | 19.01.2011 | SK | 19.01.2011 | SM | 19.01.2011 | TR | 19.01.2011 | BG | 19.04.2011 | NO | 19.04.2011 | GR | 20.04.2011 | ES | 30.04.2011 | IS | 19.05.2011 | PT | 19.05.2011 | LU | 06.08.2011 | BE | 31.08.2011 | FR | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MK | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
SM | 19.01.2011 | ||
TR | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
LU | 06.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MK | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
SM | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
LU | 06.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MK | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
SM | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MK | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
HR | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 19.01.2011 | |
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
NO | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3576112 (FROST RALPH S, et al) [Y] 7 * figure 2 * * abstract *; | [Y]US5239787 (ABBOTT KENNETH E [US], et al) [Y] 9 * column 4, lines 45-48 ** figure 3 *; | [Y]US5605496 (PICKARD ROBERT W [US]) [Y] 9 * figures 1,2 * * abstract *; | [XY]DE10213933 (PEGUFORM GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-6,8,10,11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] , [0008] , [0009] , [0011] , [0012] , [0023] , [0030] , [0031] , [0034] , [0038] , [0044] - [0049] - [0051] * * figures 6,7 * * abstract * [Y] 7,9 | by applicant | DE10224778 |