EP2116713 - Internal combustion engine knock determination device and knock determination method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | For all designated states Nippon Soken, Inc. 14 Iwaya Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-shi Aichi 445-0012 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Soken, Inc. 14 Iwaya Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-shi Aichi 445-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oe, Shuhei c/o Nippon Soken, Inc. 14, Iwaya, Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-shi, Aichi-ken, 445-0012 / JP | 02 /
Ohara, Kouzi c/o Nippon Soken, Inc. 14, Iwaya, Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-shi, Aichi-ken, 445-0012 / JP | 03 /
Masuda, Satoshi c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8661 / JP | 04 /
Takemura, Yuuichi c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8661 / JP | 05 /
Kaneko, Rihito c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 06 /
Kasashima, Kenji c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 07 /
Yoshihara, Masatomo c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 08 /
Senda, Kenji c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 09 /
Hanai, Norihito c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 10 /
Yamasako, Yasuhiro c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 09010526.3 | 01.10.2007 | [2009/46] | Priority number, date | JP20060274948 | 06.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006274948 | JP20070125892 | 10.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007125892 | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2116713 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2116713 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2116713 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02D45/00 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
G01M15/11 (EP,US);
F02D35/027 (EP,US);
G01L23/225 (EP,US);
F02D41/1498 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Beurteilung des Klopfens einer Brennkraftmaschine und Verfahren zur Beurteilung des Klopfens | [2011/23] | English: | Internal combustion engine knock determination device and knock determination method | [2009/46] | French: | Dispositif de jugement de cliquetis de moteur à combustion interne et procédé de jugement de cliquetis | [2011/23] |
Former [2009/46] | Vorrichtung zur Beurteilung des Klopfens einer Brennkraftmaschine und Verfahren zur beuerteilung des Klopfens | ||
Former [2009/46] | Dispositif de jugement de cliquetis de moteur à combustion interne et procédéL de jugement de cliquetis | Examination procedure | 14.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 12.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07829279.4 / EP2071170 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.2011 | BE | 13.04.2011 | CY | 13.04.2011 | CZ | 13.04.2011 | DK | 13.04.2011 | EE | 13.04.2011 | FI | 13.04.2011 | HU | 13.04.2011 | IT | 13.04.2011 | LT | 13.04.2011 | LV | 13.04.2011 | MT | 13.04.2011 | NL | 13.04.2011 | PL | 13.04.2011 | RO | 13.04.2011 | SE | 13.04.2011 | SI | 13.04.2011 | SK | 13.04.2011 | TR | 13.04.2011 | BG | 13.07.2011 | GR | 14.07.2011 | ES | 24.07.2011 | IS | 13.08.2011 | PT | 16.08.2011 | IE | 01.10.2011 | LU | 01.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
TR | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
IE | 01.10.2011 | ||
LU | 01.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
IE | 01.10.2011 | ||
LU | 01.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
IE | 01.10.2011 | ||
LU | 01.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
IE | 01.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
IE | 01.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
PT | 16.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11270400 (UNISIA JECS CORP) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US2005251320 (KASASHIMA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0105] - [0110] *; | [A]US2006136117 (KANEKO RIHITO [JP], et al) [A] 1,15 * paragraphs [0041] - [0052] * | by applicant | JPH11270400 | US2006136117 |