EP2289457 - Dental cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENTSPLY DETREY GmbH De-Trey-Strasse 1 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evers, Markus Himmelreichweg 5 78476 Allensbach / DE | 02 /
Schuh, Walter Dr. Eugen Zehme Strasse 40 5111 Bürmoos / AT | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09010966.1 | 31.08.2009 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2289457 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/06, A61C17/20 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
A61C17/20 (EP);
A61C5/66 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zahnärztliche Ampulle | [2011/09] | English: | Dental cartridge | [2011/09] | French: | Cartouche dentaire | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6059570 (DRAGAN WILLIAM B [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 50 - line 63 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 4 * * column 6, line 7 - line 10 * * figures 1,3,7,13; claim 4 * [Y] 2-4,6,10,12; | [Y]US6450810 (FISCHER DAN E [US], et al) [Y] 2-4,6,12 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US7014462 (TILSE RAINER [DE]) [Y] 10,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005056970 (FOUST KEVIN D [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005147939 (ZUMKELLER HANS-JOACHIM [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3581399 | US3900954 | EP0948942 | EP1210025 |