EP2159259 - A structure comprising chitosan and collagen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimada, Toshio Fujifilm Corporation 798, Miyanodai Kaisei-machi, Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | [2010/09] | Representative(s) | Siegert, Georg Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Siegert, Georg Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09011055.2 | 28.08.2009 | [2010/09] | Priority number, date | JP20080220099 | 28.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008220099 | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2159259 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L5/08, C08L89/00, C08L89/06 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
C08L89/00 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
C08L5/08 (EP,US);
C08L89/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L5/08, C08L2666/26 (EP,US);
C08L89/00, C08L2666/26 (US,EP);
C08L89/06, C08L2666/26 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Struktur mit Chitosan und Kollagen | [2010/09] | English: | A structure comprising chitosan and collagen | [2010/09] | French: | Structure comportant du chitosan et du collagène | [2010/09] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 05.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/41] | 25.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4572906 (SPARKES BRIAN G [CA], et al); | [X]EP0371736 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]); | [X]WO0016817 (KOREA ATOMIC ENERGY RES [KR]); | [X]US2002086977 (LAI HUEY-MIN [TW], et al); | by applicant | JPS56133344B | JPS6359706B | EP1014176 | WO02052342 | EP0926543 | WO2004085473 | EP1063565 | US6992172 |