EP2127750 - Lock for a container for holding fluid samples and container with such a lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qiagen GmbH Qiagen Strasse 1 40724 Hilden / DE | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wegener, Uta Im Hederichsfeld 84 51379 Leverkusen/Opladen / DE | 02 /
Nelles, Thomas Zepellinallee 57 60487 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
Mertens, Dennis Gerresheimer Strasse 114 40721 Hilden / DE | [2010/22] |
Former [2010/11] | 01 /
Wegener, Uta Im Hederichsfeld 84 51379 Leverkusen/Opladen / DE | ||
02 /
Nelles, Thomas Hüttenstrasse 144 40227 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03 /
Mertens, Dennis Gerresheimer Strasse 114 40721 Hilden / DE | Representative(s) | Buse, Mentzel, Ludewig Patentanwaltskanzlei Kleiner Werth 34 42275 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Patentanwälte Buse, Mentzel, Ludewig Kleiner Werth 34 42275 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 09011241.8 | 06.05.2008 | [2009/49] | Previously filed application, date | EP20080008485 | 06.05.2008 | [2009/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2127750 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2127750 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/14, B65D47/28 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
B01L3/50825 (EP);
B01L2200/141 (EP);
B01L2300/049 (EP);
G01N2035/00287 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verschluss für einen Behälter zur Aufnahme von flüssigen Proben und Behälter mit einem solchen | [2009/49] | English: | Lock for a container for holding fluid samples and container with such a lock | [2009/49] | French: | Fermeture pour un récipient destiné à la réception d'échantillons liquides et récipient en étant équipé | [2009/49] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 12.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 09.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08008485.8 / EP2116306 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080008485) is 12.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH658438 (SASEB AG) [X] 1,3-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US2672257 (SIMMONDS IRVING H) [X] 1,3-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE955542 (FUNKE PAUL & CO GMBH) [A] 1-7 * figure 1; claims 1-3,5 * | by applicant | DE7610107U | DE3201691 | CH658438 | US2672257 |