EP2161099 - Grinding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haas Schleifmaschinen GmbH Im Sandbruch 1 78647 Trossingen / DE | [2010/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reiser, Hubert Ambros Brunnenstrasse 2 78592 Egesheim / DE | 02 /
Erchinger, Peter Gerenstrasse 3 78591 Durchhausen / DE | 03 /
Braun, Hans-Dieter Jäuchstrasse 11 78665 Frittlingen / DE | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | Mussgnug, Bernd Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09011250.9 | 02.09.2009 | [2010/10] | Priority number, date | DE20081046086 | 08.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008046086 | [2010/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2161099 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2161099 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | [2010/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2161099 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B24B3/34, B24B41/06 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
B24B3/343 (EP);
B24B41/062 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/10] | B24B3/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/10] | Title | German: | Schleifmaschine | [2010/10] | English: | Grinding machine | [2010/10] | French: | Affûteuse | [2010/10] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 25.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.01.2012
21.03.2017
WITHDRAWN Wendt GmbH Fritz-Wendt-Strasse 1 40670 Meerbusch / DE Opponent's representative Dr. Stark & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al, et al Moerser Straße 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.01.2012
21.03.2017
WITHDRAWN Wendt GmbH Fritz-Wendt-Strasse 1 40670 Meerbusch / DE Opponent's representative Dr. Stark & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al, et al Patentanwälte Moerser Straße 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [2015/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.01.2012
18.01.2012
ADMISSIBLE Wendt GmbH Fritz-Wendt-Strasse 1 40670 Meerbusch / DE Opponent's representative DR. STARK & PARTNER, et al, et al Patentanwälte Moerser Straße 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [2012/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.01.2012
18.01.2012
ADMISSIBLE Wendt GmbH Fritz-Wendt-Strasse 1 40670 Meerbusch / DE Opponent's representative Stark, Jens Christian, et al, et al Dr. Stark & Partner Patentanwälte Moerser Strasse 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | 17.02.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.06.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.04.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.09.2017 | 12.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 22.04.2017 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2017/35] | 20.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.04.2011 | DK | 13.04.2011 | EE | 13.04.2011 | FI | 13.04.2011 | HR | 13.04.2011 | HU | 13.04.2011 | IE | 13.04.2011 | LT | 13.04.2011 | LV | 13.04.2011 | MK | 13.04.2011 | MT | 13.04.2011 | NL | 13.04.2011 | PL | 13.04.2011 | RO | 13.04.2011 | SI | 13.04.2011 | SK | 13.04.2011 | SM | 13.04.2011 | TR | 13.04.2011 | BG | 13.07.2011 | NO | 13.07.2011 | GR | 14.07.2011 | IS | 13.08.2011 | PT | 16.08.2011 | LU | 02.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | AT | 02.09.2014 | ES | 03.09.2014 | SE | 03.09.2014 | BE | 30.09.2014 | [2016/12] |
Former [2016/10] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
HU | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MK | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
SM | 13.04.2011 | ||
TR | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
LU | 02.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
HU | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MK | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
SM | 13.04.2011 | ||
TR | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
LU | 02.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
HU | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MK | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
SM | 13.04.2011 | ||
TR | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
LU | 02.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2013/45] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
HU | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MK | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
SM | 13.04.2011 | ||
TR | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
LU | 02.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MK | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
SM | 13.04.2011 | ||
TR | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
LU | 02.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MK | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
SM | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
LU | 02.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2828168 (HUFFMAN S E CORP) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE4301214 (AGATHON AG MASCHF [CH]) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [AD]DE102006035845 (JUNKER ERWIN MASCHF GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * figures 1-12 * | by applicant | DE2828168 | DE4301214 | DE4240063 | DE102006035845 |