EP2293387 - Combination attachment element for attaching electric conductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens AG Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herwehe, Swen Kleine Seite 32a 02763 Mittelherwigsdorf / DE | [2011/10] | Application number, filing date | 09011287.1 | 02.09.2009 | [2011/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2293387 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/44, H01R4/48, // H01R13/115, H01R13/24 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
H01R4/44 (EP);
H01R4/4821 (EP);
H01R13/115 (EP);
H01R13/24 (EP);
H01R4/485 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kombianschlusselement zum Anschluss für elektrische Leiter | [2011/10] | English: | Combination attachment element for attaching electric conductors | [2011/10] | French: | Elément de raccordement combiné pour le raccordement de conducteurs électriques | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 26.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/46] | 29.06.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH678776 (SCHRACK COMPONENTS AG); | [X]DE10131070 (ELLENBERGER & POENSGEN [DE]); | [A]WO2004070756 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]DE102007058495 (POLLMANN ELEKTROTECH GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | EP2009745 |