EP2292116 - Eyelash curling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEI-CHI-NA HSINYEN Co., Ltd. 2F., No. 48 Lane 188 Rueiguang Rd. Neihu, Taipei City / TW | [2011/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Su-Lin 2F., No.48, Lane 188, Rueiguang Rd., Neihu District Taipei City / TW | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Karakatsanis, Georgios, et al Haft Karakatsanis Patentanwaltskanzlei Schönfelstraße 26 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Karakatsanis, Georgios, et al Haft - Karakatsanis Occamstrasse 3 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09011345.7 | 03.09.2009 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292116 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A45D2/48 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
A45D2/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wimpernzangenvorrichtung | [2011/10] | English: | Eyelash curling device | [2011/10] | French: | Dispositif pour recourber les cils | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 01.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/16] | 10.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2001299431 (CUTTING STUDIO KIMURA KK) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0010] - [0011] * * figures 1-11 *; | [A]KR20090006255 (GAEASOFT CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0024] , [0025] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2044209 (GUSTAVE GLATZER) [A] 1 * page 1, column 2, lines 6-11 * * figures 1,2,4,5,8 *; | [A]JPS4837079 (---) [A] 1 * figures 1,2,3,4a,4b * |