EP2292103 - Sweetening composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rudolf Wild GmbH & Co. KG Rudolf-Wild-Strasse 107-115 69214 Eppelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states RUDOLF WILD GmbH & CO. KG Rudolf-Wild-Strasse 107-115 69214 Eppelheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wild, Hans-Peter Rudolf-Wild Strasse 107-115 69214 Eppelheim / DE | 02 /
Salom, Rafael Avenida Virgen de Oreto, N. 18 46250 L'Alcudia, Valencia / ES | 03 /
Sattler, Robert Gartenstrasse 35 68723 Oftersheim / DE | [2011/10] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09011503.1 | 08.09.2009 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2292103 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2292103 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/222, A23L1/236, A23L1/30, A23L2/02, A23L2/60, A23L1/22 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
A23L27/36 (EP,US);
A23L27/13 (EP,US);
A23L27/84 (EP,US);
A23L27/86 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/16, A23V2250/21, A23V2250/262 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/10] | Title | German: | Süssungszusammensetzung | [2011/10] | English: | Sweetening composition | [2011/10] | French: | Composition d'édulcorant | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 15.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2009 | AT | 07.03.2012 | BE | 07.03.2012 | CY | 07.03.2012 | CZ | 07.03.2012 | DK | 07.03.2012 | EE | 07.03.2012 | FI | 07.03.2012 | HR | 07.03.2012 | LT | 07.03.2012 | LV | 07.03.2012 | MK | 07.03.2012 | MT | 07.03.2012 | NL | 07.03.2012 | PL | 07.03.2012 | RO | 07.03.2012 | SE | 07.03.2012 | SI | 07.03.2012 | SK | 07.03.2012 | SM | 07.03.2012 | TR | 07.03.2012 | BG | 07.06.2012 | NO | 07.06.2012 | GR | 08.06.2012 | IS | 07.07.2012 | PT | 09.07.2012 | IE | 08.09.2012 | LU | 08.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 08.09.2009 | |
AT | 07.03.2012 | ||
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
SM | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 08.09.2012 | ||
LU | 08.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
SM | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 08.09.2012 | ||
LU | 08.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 08.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 08.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
IE | 08.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 07.03.2012 | |
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
NL | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
NO | 07.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2006238828 ; | [A]US2007116840 (PRAKASH INDRA [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0028] , [0037] , [0042] - [0059] - [0102] , [0113] , [0114]; examples A2-A4; claims 1-3,7,9,11-18,36-44,48,50,84-99 *; | [A]WO2007061795 (COCA COLA CO [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0101] , [0109] , [0110]; example E18; claims 1,5,7-23,45,58,70-84,125-134 *; | [AD]EP2002734 (WILD VALENCIA S A [ES]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 66, Database accession no. 2006-631780, XP002557173 & JP2006238828 A 20060914 (OGAWA KORYO KK) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2007061802 | EP2002734 |