EP2163325 - Method for producing a gas container, in particular for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benteler SGL GmbH & Co. KG A der Talle 27 33102 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states Benteler SGL GmbH & Co., KG A der Talle 27 33102 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howe, Christian Schatenweg 106 33104 Paderborn / DE | 02 /
Handing, Christian, Dr. Königsallee 33 33449 Langenberg / DE | 03 /
Sahebkar, Bahmann Menzelweg 5 40724 Hilden / DE | 04 /
Grasser, Sebastian Leitenweg 11 86316 Friedberg / DE | 05 /
Wohletz, Bernd Am Heissanger 1 86405 Meitingen / DE | 06 /
Schmidt, Tobias Nebelhornstrasse 6 86163 Augsburg / DE | 07 /
Putz, Thomas Am Kornfeld 3 86707 Westendorf / DE | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Griepenstroh, Jörg Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | Griepenstroh, Jörg Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 09011626.0 | 11.09.2009 | [2010/11] | Priority number, date | DE20081047352 | 15.09.2008 Original published format: DE102008047352 | [2010/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2163325 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2163325 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B21D51/24, F17C1/02 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
B21D51/24 (EP);
F17C1/06 (EP);
F17C2201/0109 (EP);
F17C2201/056 (EP);
F17C2203/0604 (EP);
F17C2203/0617 (EP);
F17C2203/0619 (EP);
F17C2203/0639 (EP);
F17C2203/0648 (EP);
F17C2203/0663 (EP);
F17C2205/0323 (EP);
F17C2205/0397 (EP);
F17C2209/221 (EP);
F17C2209/227 (EP);
F17C2209/232 (EP);
F17C2221/012 (EP);
F17C2221/033 (EP);
F17C2223/0123 (EP);
F17C2223/035 (EP);
F17C2260/011 (EP);
F17C2260/012 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gasbehaelters, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2010/11] | English: | Method for producing a gas container, in particular for motor vehicles | [2010/11] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un réservoir à gaz, en particulier pour un véhicule automobile | [2010/11] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 03.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3815773 (DUVALL P, et al) [I] 1-13 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 64 - column 5, line 38 * * column 7, lines 33-65 *; | [I]US2007267107 (MICHLER THORSTEN [DE]) [I] 1,4,5 * page 3; table 1 * * page 38 *; | [I]US5284996 (VICKERS BRIAN D [US]) [I] 1,4,5 * column 3, line 36 * * column 4, line 40 *; | [A]US3255051 (GILBERT LAWRENCE L) [A] 1-13 * column 2; table 1 *; | [A]US3258370 (STEPHEN FLOREEN, et al) [A] 1-13 * column 7; table 1 *; | [A]US4073400 (BROOK GREVILLE BERTRAM, et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US3268103 (NELSON GEORGE A) [A] 1-13 * column 3 - line 2 * | by applicant | EP0410884 | DE19502992 |