EP2299235 - Device for measuring a distance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens AG Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tidona, Fausto Bergstrasse 17 40699 Erkrath / DE | [2011/12] | Application number, filing date | 09011730.0 | 14.09.2009 | [2011/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2299235 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/16, G02B6/26, G02B23/24 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
G01B11/14 (EP);
G02B6/262 (EP);
G02B7/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Signaleinrichtung zur Messung eines Abstandes | [2011/12] | English: | Device for measuring a distance | [2011/12] | French: | Dispositif pour la mesure d'un intervalle | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 03.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6287300 (KONDO HIROAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 15 - line 64 * * column 9, line 3 - line 7 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE9412590U (ELROG GMBH & CO ELEKTRONENROEH [DE]) [X] 1-8 * page 4, line 27 - page 6, line 14 * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]DE19502006 (HERAEUS NOBLELIGHT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - column 5, line 44 * * figures 1-5 * |