EP2192353 - Device for determining the pressure differential in a hot water heating assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUMMEL AG Lise-Meitner-Strasse 2 79211 Denzlingen / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Hummel AG Lise-Meitner-Strasse 2 79211 Denzlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zügel, Fritz Bürgerwehrstrasse 12 79183 Waldkirch / DE | 02 /
Gerber, Philipp Elzstrasse 17 79261 Gutach / DE | 03 /
Hagen, Lynn Laube 1 79353 Bahlingen / DE | 04 /
Haller, Stefan Talstrasse 21 A 79263 Simonswald / DE | [2010/22] | Representative(s) | Kunst, Manuel Nikolaus Johannes, et al Maucher Jenkins Patent-und Rechtsanwälte Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Kunst, Manuel Nikolaus Johannes, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | ||
Former [2010/22] | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | Application number, filing date | 09011895.1 | 18.09.2009 | [2010/22] | Priority number, date | DE20082015824U | 01.12.2008 Original published format: DE 202008015824 U | [2010/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2192353 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2192353 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2192353 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/00, F24D19/10 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
F24D19/1009 (EP,US);
F24D19/0002 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/24] | F24D19/10, F24H9/12 | ||
Former IPC [2010/22] | F24D19/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Ermittlung der Druckdifferenz an einer Warmwasser-Heizanlage | [2010/22] | English: | Device for determining the pressure differential in a hot water heating assembly | [2010/22] | French: | Dispositif de détermination de la différence de pression sur une installation d'eau chaude | [2010/22] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 17.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2009 | BG | 25.03.2015 | CY | 25.03.2015 | CZ | 25.03.2015 | DK | 25.03.2015 | EE | 25.03.2015 | ES | 25.03.2015 | FI | 25.03.2015 | HR | 25.03.2015 | IT | 25.03.2015 | LT | 25.03.2015 | LV | 25.03.2015 | MC | 25.03.2015 | MK | 25.03.2015 | MT | 25.03.2015 | NL | 25.03.2015 | PL | 25.03.2015 | RO | 25.03.2015 | SE | 25.03.2015 | SI | 25.03.2015 | SK | 25.03.2015 | SM | 25.03.2015 | TR | 25.03.2015 | NO | 25.06.2015 | GR | 26.06.2015 | IS | 25.07.2015 | PT | 27.07.2015 | AT | 18.09.2015 | GB | 18.09.2015 | IE | 18.09.2015 | LU | 18.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | FR | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
BG | 25.03.2015 | ||
CY | 25.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2015 | ||
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
SM | 25.03.2015 | ||
TR | 25.03.2015 | ||
NO | 25.06.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
AT | 18.09.2015 | ||
GB | 18.09.2015 | ||
IE | 18.09.2015 | ||
LU | 18.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/17] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
MT | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
AT | 18.09.2015 | ||
GB | 18.09.2015 | ||
IE | 18.09.2015 | ||
LU | 18.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
GB | 18.09.2015 | ||
IE | 18.09.2015 | ||
LU | 18.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
GB | 18.09.2015 | ||
IE | 18.09.2015 | ||
LU | 18.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
IE | 18.09.2015 | ||
LU | 18.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SI | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
MC | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
LU | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
DK | 25.03.2015 | ||
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
PL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
IS | 25.07.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.03.2015 | |
EE | 25.03.2015 | ||
ES | 25.03.2015 | ||
FI | 25.03.2015 | ||
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
RO | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
SK | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
PT | 27.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
NL | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
LV | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
GR | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.03.2015 | |
HR | 25.03.2015 | ||
LT | 25.03.2015 | ||
SE | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0063530 (DESBORDES A ETS [FR]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * page 1, line 10 - page 2, line 2 * * page 7, line 1 - line 39 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0152226 (FLUID DEVICES LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0945668 (BRITISH GAS PLC [GB]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [YD]DE10211533 (GAMPPER ARMATUREN GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0063530 | DE10211533 | DE10211533 |