EP2174783 - Compound on the basis of thermoplastic fluoropolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fitz, Johannes Gewerbering 7 83370 Seeon / DE | [2010/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fitz, Johannes Gewerbering 7 83370 Seeon / DE | [2011/51] |
Former [2010/15] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09011992.6 | 21.09.2009 | [2010/15] | Priority number, date | DE20082013246U | 08.10.2008 Original published format: DE 202008013246 U | [2010/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2174783 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2174783 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/12, B32B27/28, B32B27/30, D06N3/04 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
B32B27/30 (EP);
B32B27/12 (EP);
B32B27/28 (EP);
D06M15/256 (EP);
D06M17/06 (EP);
D06N3/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/15] | Title | German: | Verbund auf Basis von thermoplastischem Fluorpolymer | [2010/15] | English: | Compound on the basis of thermoplastic fluoropolymer | [2010/15] | French: | Composite à base de fluoropolymère thermoplastique | [2010/15] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 25.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2009 | CY | 21.12.2011 | CZ | 21.12.2011 | DK | 21.12.2011 | EE | 21.12.2011 | FI | 21.12.2011 | HR | 21.12.2011 | IE | 21.12.2011 | IT | 21.12.2011 | LT | 21.12.2011 | LV | 21.12.2011 | MK | 21.12.2011 | MT | 21.12.2011 | NL | 21.12.2011 | PL | 21.12.2011 | RO | 21.12.2011 | SE | 21.12.2011 | SI | 21.12.2011 | SK | 21.12.2011 | SM | 21.12.2011 | TR | 21.12.2011 | BG | 21.03.2012 | NO | 21.03.2012 | GR | 22.03.2012 | ES | 01.04.2012 | IS | 21.04.2012 | PT | 23.04.2012 | LU | 21.09.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 21.09.2009 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
SM | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
LU | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
SM | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
LU | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 21.12.2011 | |
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 21.12.2011 | |
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 21.12.2011 | |
NO | 21.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29620579U (FITZ JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 2; example 3; claims 1,3,4 * * page 2, paragraph 5 * * page 3, lines 5,15-17 *; | [A]DE202004020048U (FITZ JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0015] , [0018] - [0020]; claim - *; | [A]US2007032152 (KELMARTIN THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0022] , [0023]; claims 1,5,6,32 * | by applicant | EP1674255 |