EP2135588 - Prostheses with mechanically operable digit members [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Touch Emas Limited Unit 3 Ashwood Court Oakbank Park Way Livingston EH53 0TH / GB | [2011/31] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Touch Emas Limited Quarter Mile One 15 Lauriston Place Edinburgh EH3 9EP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gow, David James c/o Touch Emas Limited Quarter Mile One 15 Lauriston Place Edinburgh, EH3 9EP / GB | [2011/38] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
Gow, David James c/o Touch Emas Limited Quarter Mile One 15 Lauriston Place Edinburgh, EH3 9EP / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | 01 /
Glow, David James c/o Touch Emas Limited Quarter Mile One 15 Lauriston Place Edinburgh, EH3 9EP / GB | Representative(s) | Peter, Kenneth William Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Peter, Kenneth William Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Peter, Kenneth William Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09012179.9 | 19.07.2006 | [2009/52] | Priority number, date | GB20050024284 | 29.11.2005 Original published format: GB 0524284 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2135588 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2135588 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | [2009/53] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2135588 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2135588 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/58, A61F2/68 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
A61F2/583 (EP,US);
A61F2/586 (EP,US);
A61F2/72 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30523 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30525 (EP,US);
A61F2002/5001 (EP,US);
A61F2002/5073 (EP,US);
A61F2002/509 (EP,US);
A61F2002/587 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | Prothesen mit mechanisch beweglichen Fingerelementen | [2009/52] | English: | Prostheses with mechanically operable digit members | [2009/52] | French: | Prothèses à membres digités actionnables mécaniquement | [2009/52] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 25.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06765015.0 / EP1962731 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060765015) is 26.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2006 | AT | 21.09.2011 | BE | 21.09.2011 | CY | 21.09.2011 | CZ | 21.09.2011 | EE | 21.09.2011 | FI | 21.09.2011 | LT | 21.09.2011 | LV | 21.09.2011 | PL | 21.09.2011 | RO | 21.09.2011 | SI | 21.09.2011 | SK | 21.09.2011 | TR | 21.09.2011 | BG | 21.12.2011 | IS | 21.01.2012 | PT | 23.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
TR | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
BE | 21.09.2011 | ||
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 21.09.2011 | |
CY | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2592842 (ALDERSON SAMUEL W) [A] 1-15 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4623354 (CHILDRESS DUDLEY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 7 - column 5; figures 1,5-9; claim - *; | [A]US4955918 (LEE SUKHAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]WO9524875 (ROYAL INFIRMARY OF EDINBURGH N [GB], et al) [AD] 1-2,8,10-15 * page 1, line 34 - page 7, line 9; figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE19854762 (FRANKE MARC [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,11,13-14 * column 1, line 65 - column 6, line 31; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US6361570 (GOW DAVID JAMES [GB]) [A] 1-15 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2005021155 (BRIMALM STELLAN [SE]) [A] 1-15* figures 3-6; claim - * | by applicant | WO9524875 |