EP2306145 - Optical sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leuze electronic GmbH + Co. KG In der Braike 1 73277 Owen/Teck / DE | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klaß, Dieter Frickenhauser Strasse 36 72636 Frickenhausen / DE | 02 /
Weber, Jürgen-Ralf Wieselweg 10 73061 Ebersbach / DE | 03 /
Essig, Horst Auf dem Berg 14/1 73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE | 04 /
Geiger, Fabian Brühlstraße 45 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [2011/40] |
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
Klaß, Dieter Frickenhauser Strasse 36 72636 Frickenhausen / DE | ||
02 /
Weber, Jürgen-Ralf Wieselweg 10 73061 Ebersbach / DE | |||
03 /
Essig, Horst Auf dem Berg 14/1 73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE | |||
04 /
Geiger, Fabian Eltinger Weg 8 71277 Rutesheim / DE | Representative(s) | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Ruckh Jurastraße 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Fabrikstrasse 18 73277 Owen/Teck / DE | ||
Former [2011/14] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Fabrikstrasse 18 73277 Owen/Teck / DE | Application number, filing date | 09012302.7 | 29.09.2009 | [2011/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2306145 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2306145 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/02, G01B11/25, G01V8/12 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
G01V8/20 (EP,US);
G01B11/02 (SE);
G01B11/024 (EP,US);
G01B11/2518 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, TR [2011/40] |
Former [2011/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Optischer Sensor | [2011/14] | English: | Optical sensor | [2011/14] | French: | Capteur optique | [2011/14] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2010 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 15.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6064759 (BUCKLEY B SHAWN [US], et al); | [X]US2005111009 (KEIGHTLEY JOHN [CA], et al); | [A]EP1612509 (SICK IVP AB [SE]); | [X]US7375826 (LAVELLE JOSEPH P [US], et al); | [X]WO2008107892 (ADVANCED VISION TECHNOLOGY AVT [IL], et al); | [A]DE102008005064 (SICK AG [DE]); | by applicant | US6064759 | EP0892280 | US2005111009 | US7375826 | WO2008107892 |