EP2140809 - Collecting activity information to evaluate therapy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway N.E. Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heruth, Kenneth T. 4904 Bruce Avenue Edina, MN 55424 / US | 02 /
Miesel, Keith A. 896 Ashland Avenue St. Paul, MN 55104 / US | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09012653.3 | 16.03.2005 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | US20040553778P | 16.03.2004 Original published format: US 553778 P | US20040825965 | 15.04.2004 Original published format: US 825965 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2140809 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2140809 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/11, A61N1/365 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
A61M5/1723 (EP,US);
A61B5/02055 (EP,US);
A61B5/1118 (EP,US);
A61B5/369 (EP,US);
A61B5/389 (EP,US);
A61B5/6814 (EP,US);
A61B5/6826 (EP,US);
A61B5/6831 (EP,US);
A61B5/6838 (EP,US);
A61M5/14276 (EP,US);
A61N1/36071 (EP,US);
A61N1/365 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0219 (EP,US);
A61B5/0031 (EP,US);
A61B5/1455 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | Sammlung von Aktivitätsdaten zur Bewertung einer Therapie | [2010/01] | English: | Collecting activity information to evaluate therapy | [2010/01] | French: | Collecte d'informations d'activité pour évaluer une thérapie | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 04.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05727233.8 / EP1737343 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2005 | AT | 18.05.2011 | BE | 18.05.2011 | CY | 18.05.2011 | CZ | 18.05.2011 | DK | 18.05.2011 | EE | 18.05.2011 | FI | 18.05.2011 | IT | 18.05.2011 | LT | 18.05.2011 | NL | 18.05.2011 | PL | 18.05.2011 | RO | 18.05.2011 | SE | 18.05.2011 | SI | 18.05.2011 | SK | 18.05.2011 | TR | 18.05.2011 | BG | 18.08.2011 | GR | 19.08.2011 | ES | 29.08.2011 | IS | 18.09.2011 | PT | 19.09.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
TR | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 18.05.2011 | |
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 18.05.2011 | |
PT | 19.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6045513 (STONE KAREN A [US], et al) [A] 8,9 * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 28 * * column 7, lines 50-63 * * column 9, line 1 - column 10, line 13 * * column 13, line 55 - column 14, line 18 *; | [A]US6120467 (SCHALLHORN RICK [US]) [A] 1,4-6,10,11,15 * column 5, lines 35-65; figures 3a,3b * * column 3, lines 31-38 *; | [A]WO0137930 (INTERMEDICS INC [US]) [A] 2 * abstract * * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 4; figure 1; claims 2,3 * * page 9, line 16 - page 13, line 2 * * page 15, line 11 - page 18, line 21 *; | [A]US2002077562 (KALGREN JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1,13,14 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0046] - [0048] - [0053] , [0054]; figures 7,8 *; | [A]US6459934 (KADHIRESAN VEERICHETTY [US]) [A] 1,13,14 * column 3, lines 11-29; figures 1,9,10 * * column 6, lines 42-64 *; | [A]US2002161412 (SUN WEIMIN [US], et al) [A] 1,13,14 * paragraphs [0011] , [0023] - [0030] - [0035] - [0037]; figures 4-6 *; | [A]US6539249 (KADHIRESAN VEERICHETTY A [US], et al) [A] 1,4-6,8-11 * column 2, lines 32-61 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 33 * * column 5, lines 1-19 * * column 5, lines 20-39 *; | [A]US2003153953 (PARK EULJOON [US], et al) [A] 3* paragraphs [0045] , [0054] , [0055] , [0090] *; | [A]US2003212445 (WEINBERG LISA P [US]) [A] 3 * paragraphs [0006] , [0036] , [0037]; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US6659968 (MCCLURE KELLY H [US]) [A] 1,10,11,15,2,3,8,9 * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 11; figures 1-3,6 * * column 6, lines 12-22 * * column 6, lines 31-54 * |