EP2239392 - Holding clamp for a roof decking panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friedrich Ossenberg-Schule GmbH + Co. KG Amerikastrasse 2 58675 Hemer / DE | [2014/23] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states Friedrich Ossenberg-Schule & Söhne GmbH. & Co. KG. Hauptstrasse 2-6 58762 Altena / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaemper, Jan Unterm Leisenberg 11 58802 Balve / DE | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Köchling, Conrad-Joachim Patentanwälte Köchling, Döring PartG mbB Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Köchling, Conrad-Joachim Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Conrad-Joachim Köchling Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | ||
Former [2010/41] | Köchling, Conrad-Joachim Patentanwalt Fleyer Strasse 135 58097 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09012806.7 | 09.10.2009 | [2010/41] | Priority number, date | DE20091016548 | 06.04.2009 Original published format: DE102009016548 | [2010/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2239392 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2239392 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2239392 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04D1/34 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
E04D1/34 (EP,US);
E04D2001/3414 (EP,US);
E04D2001/3438 (EP,US);
E04D2001/3458 (EP,US);
E04D2001/3473 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/41] | Title | German: | Halteklammer für eine Dacheindeckungsplatte | [2010/41] | English: | Holding clamp for a roof decking panel | [2010/41] | French: | Etrier de retenue d'un élément de couverture de toiture | [2010/41] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 19.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 04.06.2014 | CY | 04.06.2014 | CZ | 04.06.2014 | DK | 04.06.2014 | ES | 04.06.2014 | FI | 04.06.2014 | HR | 04.06.2014 | IT | 04.06.2014 | LT | 04.06.2014 | LV | 04.06.2014 | MC | 04.06.2014 | MK | 04.06.2014 | MT | 04.06.2014 | RO | 04.06.2014 | SK | 04.06.2014 | SM | 04.06.2014 | NO | 04.09.2014 | GR | 05.09.2014 | IS | 04.10.2014 | PT | 06.10.2014 | IE | 09.10.2014 | LU | 09.10.2014 | BE | 31.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/15] | BG | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MK | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
TR | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.10.2014 | ||
LU | 09.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2018/30] | BG | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MK | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.10.2014 | ||
LU | 09.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | BG | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.10.2014 | ||
LU | 09.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.10.2014 | ||
LU | 09.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.10.2014 | ||
LU | 09.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
IE | 09.10.2014 | ||
LU | 09.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 09.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 09.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 09.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 09.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 04.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9010768 (BINDA NOMINEES PTY LTD [AU]) [I] 1-6 * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 18; figure 3 *; | [I]FR486509 (FRANCESCO ANDREA FRAZZI [IT]) [I] 1-6 * page 1, line 55 - page 2, line 18; figure 1 *; | [I]DE202005007497U (WUERTH ADOLF GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0023] - [0025]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | EP1154094 | DE202005007497U | DE19647528 | DE4108875 |