EP2175108 - Injector for a fluid injection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [2010/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stretch, Dale A. 24759 Portsmouth Novi, MI 48374 Oakland / US | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/15] | Condon, Neil, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09012922.2 | 13.10.2009 | [2010/15] | Priority number, date | US20080250220 | 13.10.2008 Original published format: US 250220 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2175108 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2175108 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01M13/04, F02M53/04, F02M51/06, F02M63/00, F01N3/20 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
F01M13/04 (EP,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
F02M51/0667 (EP,US);
F02M53/04 (EP,US);
F02M63/0015 (EP,US);
F02M63/004 (EP,US);
F02M63/0045 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/03 (EP,US);
F01N2610/11 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1453 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1473 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/15] | Title | German: | Einspritzdüse für ein Flüssigkeitseinspritzsystem | [2010/15] | English: | Injector for a fluid injection system | [2010/15] | French: | Injecteur pour système d'injection de fluide | [2010/15] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 23.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.10.2009 | AT | 15.05.2013 | BE | 15.05.2013 | CY | 15.05.2013 | CZ | 15.05.2013 | DK | 15.05.2013 | EE | 15.05.2013 | FI | 15.05.2013 | HR | 15.05.2013 | LT | 15.05.2013 | LV | 15.05.2013 | MC | 15.05.2013 | MK | 15.05.2013 | MT | 15.05.2013 | NL | 15.05.2013 | RO | 15.05.2013 | SI | 15.05.2013 | SK | 15.05.2013 | SM | 15.05.2013 | TR | 15.05.2013 | BG | 15.08.2013 | NO | 15.08.2013 | GR | 16.08.2013 | ES | 26.08.2013 | IS | 15.09.2013 | PT | 16.09.2013 | GB | 13.10.2013 | IE | 13.10.2013 | LU | 13.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 13.10.2009 | |
AT | 15.05.2013 | ||
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MK | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
TR | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 13.10.2013 | ||
IE | 13.10.2013 | ||
LU | 13.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MK | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
TR | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 13.10.2013 | ||
IE | 13.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 13.10.2013 | ||
IE | 13.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 13.10.2013 | ||
IE | 13.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 13.10.2013 | ||
IE | 13.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
GB | 13.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 15.05.2013 | |
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CH237848 (SULZER AG [CH]) [X] 1-2,7,15 * abstract * [I] 11-12; | [XYI]US3737100 (DREISIN A) [X] 1-2,7,15 * abstract * [Y] 5,8-10,14,16 [I] 11-12; | [YA]WO2005005799 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 10,14,16 * abstract * [A] 1,11,15; | [A]DE102004050022 (ORANGE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,11,15* abstract *; | [YA]DE102005028601 (VOLKSWAGEN MECHATRONIC GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5,8-9 * abstract * [A] 1,11,15; | [XP]EP2025920 (WAERTSILAE SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [XP] 1-3,11,15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0035] , [0041] , [0042] , [0044] , [0045]; figures 2,3 * | Examination | US2010082224 | EP2334921 |