EP2184256 - Industrial truck with a load arm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jungheinrich Aktiengesellschaft Am Stadtrand 35 22047 Hamburg / DE | [2010/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Magens, Ernst-Peter Steenhoop 8 22949 Ammersbek / DE | [2010/19] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/19] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09012962.8 | 14.10.2009 | [2010/19] | Priority number, date | DE20081056244 | 06.11.2008 Original published format: DE102008056244 | [2010/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2184256 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2184256 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2184256 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/12, B62B3/06 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
B66F9/12 (EP);
B62B3/06 (EP);
B62B2203/29 (EP);
B62B2206/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/19] | B66F9/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/19] | Title | German: | Flurförderzeug mit einem Lastarm | [2010/19] | English: | Industrial truck with a load arm | [2010/19] | French: | Chariot de manutention doté d'un bras de charge | [2010/19] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 29.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.10.2009 | CY | 04.01.2012 | CZ | 04.01.2012 | DK | 04.01.2012 | EE | 04.01.2012 | FI | 04.01.2012 | HR | 04.01.2012 | IE | 04.01.2012 | IT | 04.01.2012 | LT | 04.01.2012 | LV | 04.01.2012 | MK | 04.01.2012 | MT | 04.01.2012 | NL | 04.01.2012 | PL | 04.01.2012 | RO | 04.01.2012 | SI | 04.01.2012 | SK | 04.01.2012 | SM | 04.01.2012 | TR | 04.01.2012 | BG | 04.04.2012 | NO | 04.04.2012 | GR | 05.04.2012 | ES | 15.04.2012 | IS | 04.05.2012 | PT | 04.05.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 14.10.2009 | |
CY | 04.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
SM | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
SM | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
ES | 15.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
IT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 04.01.2012 | |
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 04.01.2012 | |
HR | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 04.01.2012 | |
NL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 04.01.2012 | |
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
NO | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 04.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2992749 (SPILLIOS THEMUS A) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]JPH07257894 (NIPPON YUSOKI CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract ** figure - *; | [AD]DE19639736 (LINDE AG [DE]) [AD] 1,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 24 - line 51 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 45 * * figure - *; | [A]EP0958988 (BT IND AB [SE]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019] * * figure - * | by applicant | DE19639736 |