EP2314217 - Method and device for fast measurement of frequency response with scalable short chirp signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tallinn University of Technology Ehitajate 5 11317 Tallinn / EE | For all designated states OÜ Eliko Tehnoloogia Arenduskeskus Mäealuse 2 12618 Tallinn / EE | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Tallinn University of Technology Ehitajate 5 11317 Tallinn / EE | ||
For all designated states OÜ Eliko Tehnoloogia Arenduskeskus Ehitajate tee 5 12618 Tallinn / EE | |||
Former [2011/17] | For all designated states Tallinn University of Technology Ehitajate 5 19086 Tallinn / EE | ||
For all designated states OÜ Eliko Tehnoloogia Arenduskeskus Ehitajate 5 12618 Tallinn / EE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Min, Mart Kuklase 3-4 13424 Tallinn / EE | 02 /
Paavle, Toivo Lodjapuu tee 30 12113 Tallinn / EE | 03 /
Land, Raul Akadeemia tee 7A-17 12611 Tallinn / EE | 04 /
Annus, Paul Harju 5-12 10146 Tallinn / EE | 05 /
Parve, Toomas Rännaku pst 3-7 10917 Tallinn / EE | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/25] | 01 /
Min, Mart Sõpruse pst 188A-4 12434 Tallinn / EE | ||
02 /
Paavle, Toivo Lodjapuu tee 30 12113 Tallinn / EE | |||
03 /
Land, Raul Akadeemia tee 7A-17 12611 Tallinn / EE | |||
04 /
Annus, Paul Harju 5-12 10146 Tallinn / EE | |||
05 /
Parve, Toomas Rännaku pst 3-7 10917 Tallinn / EE | |||
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
Min, Mart Sõpruse pst 188A-4 12434 Tallinn / EE | ||
02 /
Paavle, Toivo Lodjapuu tee 30 12113 Tallinn / EE | |||
03 /
Land, Raul Akadeemia tee 7A-17 12611 Tallinn / EE | |||
04 /
Annus, Paul Harju 5-12 10146 Tallinn / EE | |||
05 /
Parve, Thomas Rännaku pst 3-7 10917 Tallinn / EE | Application number, filing date | 09013404.0 | 23.10.2009 | [2011/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2314217 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2314217 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/02, G01N33/487 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
G01N27/026 (EP,US);
G01N33/48735 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0627 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/17] | A61B5/053 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur schnellen Messung des Frequenzgangs mit skalierbaren kurzen Chirp-Signalen | [2011/17] | English: | Method and device for fast measurement of frequency response with scalable short chirp signals | [2011/17] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la mesure rapide de réponse en fréquence avec des signaux de courte durée balayés en fréquence | [2011/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 27.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2009 | AT | 13.03.2013 | BE | 13.03.2013 | CY | 13.03.2013 | CZ | 13.03.2013 | DK | 13.03.2013 | EE | 13.03.2013 | FI | 13.03.2013 | HR | 13.03.2013 | IT | 13.03.2013 | LT | 13.03.2013 | LV | 13.03.2013 | MC | 13.03.2013 | MK | 13.03.2013 | MT | 13.03.2013 | NL | 13.03.2013 | PL | 13.03.2013 | RO | 13.03.2013 | SE | 13.03.2013 | SI | 13.03.2013 | SK | 13.03.2013 | SM | 13.03.2013 | TR | 13.03.2013 | BG | 13.06.2013 | NO | 13.06.2013 | GR | 14.06.2013 | ES | 24.06.2013 | IS | 13.07.2013 | PT | 15.07.2013 | IE | 23.10.2013 | LU | 23.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | FR | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 23.10.2009 | |
AT | 13.03.2013 | ||
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
MK | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
SM | 13.03.2013 | ||
TR | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
IE | 23.10.2013 | ||
LU | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
MK | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
SM | 13.03.2013 | ||
TR | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
IE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
SM | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
IE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
IE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 13.03.2013 | |
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 13.03.2013 | |
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
NO | 13.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009096821 (ST JUDE MEDICAL [SE], et al) [A] 1,14 * page 7, line 19 - page 11, line 28; figure 3 ** page 17, lines 19-32 *; | [XYI] - TOIVO PAAVLE ET AL, "Using of chirp excitation for bioimpedance estimation: Theoretical aspects and modeling", ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE, 2008. BEC 2008. 11TH INTERNATIONAL BIENNIAL BALTIC, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081006), ISBN 978-1-4244-2059-9, pages 325 - 328, XP031352724 [X] 14 * the whole document * [Y] 6 [I] 1-5,7-13,15 | [XI] - PAAVLE T ET AL, "Wideband object identification with rectangular wave chirp excitation", CIRCUIT THEORY AND DESIGN, 2009. ECCTD 2009. EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090823), ISBN 978-1-4244-3896-9, pages 421 - 424, XP031538000 [X] 14 * the whole document * [I] 1-5,7-13,15 | [Y] - TOIVO PAAVLE ET AL, "Bioimpedance monitoring with improved accuracy using three-level stimulus", CIRCUIT THEORY AND DESIGN, 2007. ECCTD 2007. 18TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070827), ISBN 978-1-4244-1341-6, pages 412 - 415, XP031257771 [Y] 6 * abstract * |