EP2163970 - Adaptable user interface and mechanism for a portable electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility, Inc. 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | [2011/09] |
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states Motorola, Inc. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cybart, Adam K 2703 Cuhlman Road Mchenry, Illinois 60051 / US | 02 /
Baciu, Paul N. 1592 Wakefield Court Mundelein Illinois 60060 / US | 03 /
Cranfill, David B. 781 Belmont Court Antioch Illinois 6002 / US | 04 /
Daverman, R. Dodge D. 1901 W. Division, Unit 3N Chicago Illinois 60622 / US | 05 /
Emmert, Steve C. 8808 N. Alto Vista Crystal Lake Illinois 60014 / US | 06 /
Foo, Ken K. 7842 Nursery Drive Gurnee Illinois 60031 / US | 07 /
Zhuang, Zhimming 23244 Chadwick Court Kildeer, Illinois 60047 / US | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 09013496.6 | 05.02.2008 | [2010/11] | Priority number, date | US20070679228 | 27.02.2007 Original published format: US 679228 | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2163970 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2163970 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
G06F1/1626 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/1662 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/1656 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/1684 (EP,US);
G06F1/169 (EP,US);
G06F3/0238 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/04144 (KR);
G06F3/0443 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0446 (KR);
G06F3/04886 (EP,KR,US);
H01H13/83 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2203/04101 (KR);
G06F2203/04804 (KR);
H01H2219/002 (EP,KR,US);
H01H2219/054 (EP,KR,US);
H01H2219/058 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/11] | G06F3/044, G06F3/045, G06F3/048, G06F1/16, G06F3/01, G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einstellbare Benutzeroberfläche und Mechanismus für eine tragbare elektronische Vorrichtung | [2010/11] | English: | Adaptable user interface and mechanism for a portable electronic device | [2010/11] | French: | Interface utilisateur adaptable et mécanisme pour dispositif électronique portable | [2010/11] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 10.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/22] | 13.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2011/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08728978.1 / EP2115555 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2348039 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 4, lines 17-30 * * page 5, lines 4-19 * * page 6, lines 1-10 * * page 7, lines 8-19 * * page 8, lines 3-8 * * page 10, lines 12-26 *; | [X]US4728936 (GUSCOTT JOHN K [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - column 2 * * column 3, lines 31-49 * * claims 1-4 *; | [X]US4017848 (TANNAS JR LAWRENCE E) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * column 6, line 12 - column 7, line 8; claims 1-8 *; | [X]GB2359178 (BRITISH IND GRAPHICS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 4 * * page 11, lines 3-26; claims 1-6 *; | [A]US6188379 (KANEKO YASUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 1, lines 45-67 * * column 3, lines 3-23 * * column 3, lines 49-55 * * column 4, lines 30-38 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US6144359 (GRAVE DUANE A [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 7 *; | [A]US4078257 (BAGLEY ALAN S) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 2, lines 30-63; figures 3,5 *; | [A]US2006146012 (ARNESON THEODORE R [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]US2005243069 (YORIO RUDY [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0 14] , [0 15] - [0020] - [0 24] , [0 25] , [0 26] *; | [A]EP1467536 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0 18] , [0 25] - [0027] - [0 29] *; | [A]US2004036680 (DAVIS MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * figures 6,7 *; | [A]US6211931 (FUKAO RYUZO [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 1, lines 6-67 * * column 5, lines 29-48 *; | [A]US5600459 (ROY HOWARD S [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 14 *; | [A]US4545648 (SHULMAN JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 1, line 20 - column 2, line 38 * * column 5, lines 14-60 * |