EP2181796 - Device and method for submerged arc welding with a powder housing comprising powder feeding and exhaust ports [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kjellberg Finsterwalde Schweisstechnik und Verschleissschutzsysteme GmbH Stockumer Strasse 28 58453 Witten / DE | [2012/51] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Kjellberg Finsterwald Schweisstechnik und Verschliessschutzsysteme GmbH Stockumer Strasse 28 58453 Witten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jüngling, Ronald Flurweg 7 03238 Massen / DE | 02 /
Krink, Volker Friedastrasse 8 03238 Finsterwalde / DE | 03 /
Kloshek, Alexander Mühlberger Strasse 7 04895 Brottewitz / DE | 04 /
Michailov, Vesselin Ahornring 32 03055 Cottbus / DE | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2010/18] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 09013710.0 | 30.10.2009 | [2010/18] | Priority number, date | DE20081056281 | 30.10.2008 Original published format: DE102008056281 | [2010/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2181796 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2181796 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/02, B23K9/18, B23K9/32 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
B23K9/0206 (EP);
B23K9/0209 (EP);
B23K9/186 (EP);
B23K9/324 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/18] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Unterpulverschweissen mit Lichtbogen mit einem eine Pulverzuführleitung und eine Pulverabführleitung aufweisenden Pulvergehäuse | [2010/18] | English: | Device and method for submerged arc welding with a powder housing comprising powder feeding and exhaust ports | [2010/18] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de soudage à l'arc sous flux en poudre avec une chambre ayant une entrée et une sortie pour la poudre | [2010/18] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 15.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2009 | CY | 19.12.2012 | CZ | 19.12.2012 | DK | 19.12.2012 | EE | 19.12.2012 | FI | 19.12.2012 | HR | 19.12.2012 | IT | 19.12.2012 | LT | 19.12.2012 | LV | 19.12.2012 | MC | 19.12.2012 | MK | 19.12.2012 | MT | 19.12.2012 | RO | 19.12.2012 | SI | 19.12.2012 | SK | 19.12.2012 | SM | 19.12.2012 | TR | 19.12.2012 | BG | 19.03.2013 | NO | 19.03.2013 | GR | 20.03.2013 | IS | 19.04.2013 | PT | 19.04.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 30.10.2009 | |
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
MK | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
SM | 19.12.2012 | ||
TR | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 19.12.2012 | |
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
MK | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
SM | 19.12.2012 | ||
TR | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 19.12.2012 | |
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
SM | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 19.12.2012 | |
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 19.12.2012 | |
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 19.12.2012 | |
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CZ | 19.12.2012 | |
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 19.12.2012 | |
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 19.12.2012 | |
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 19.12.2012 | |
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
NO | 19.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR1262252 (NORMACEM SA) [X] 1-5,8-13 * page 1, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 3, column l, paragraph l - page 3, column r, paragraph 1; figures 5a-b * [Y] 5-7,14-15; | [Y]JPS5820379 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [Y] 5-6,14-15 * abstract *; | [Y]SU1547993 ; | [A]SU1459852 ; | [A]US4414459 (SIMS JAMES E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 2; figure 2 *; | [A]SU469554 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 40, Database accession no. 1990-303401, XP002567691 & SU1547993 A1 19900307 (PATON ELECTROWELD IND) [Y] 7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 35, Database accession no. 1989-254201, XP002567692 & SU1459852 A1 19890223 (LENGD ELEKTRIK WKS) [A] 2,8 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1976, no. 08, Database accession no. 1976-14412X, XP002567693 & SU469554 A1 19750505 (PATON ELECTROWELD IND) [A] 1,10 * abstract * | by applicant | FR1262252 | JPS5820379 | SU1547993 |