EP2199736 - Hand-held device and method for determining the spatial position of an operating point of a manipulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUKA Roboter GmbH Zugspitzstrasse 140 86165 Augsburg / DE | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hietmann, Gerhard Beethovenstraße 23 86405 Herbertshofen / DE | 02 /
Sedlmayr, Andreas Kaiser-Ludwig-Straße 4 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Schlotter, Alexander Carolus Paul Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Schlotter, Alexander Carolus Paul Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/25] | Schlotter, Alexander Carolus Paul Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09013800.9 | 03.11.2009 | [2010/25] | Priority number, date | DE20081062624 | 17.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008062624 | [2010/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2199736 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2199736 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | [2011/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2199736 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01B21/04, G01B11/00, G01S5/16, B25J9/16, G01S1/00, B25J1/00 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
G01S5/163 (EP,US);
B25J9/1692 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/25] | G01B21/04, G01B11/00, B25J1/00, G01S1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | Handgerät und Verfahren zur Erfassung der Raumposition eines Arbeitspunktes eines Manipulators | [2010/25] | English: | Hand-held device and method for determining the spatial position of an operating point of a manipulator | [2010/25] | French: | Appareil manuel et procédé de détermination de la position spatiale d'un point de travail d'un manipulateur | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 18.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13000946.7 / EP2597420 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2009 | CY | 27.02.2013 | CZ | 27.02.2013 | DK | 27.02.2013 | EE | 27.02.2013 | FI | 27.02.2013 | HR | 27.02.2013 | IT | 27.02.2013 | LT | 27.02.2013 | LV | 27.02.2013 | MC | 27.02.2013 | MK | 27.02.2013 | MT | 27.02.2013 | NL | 27.02.2013 | PL | 27.02.2013 | RO | 27.02.2013 | SE | 27.02.2013 | SI | 27.02.2013 | SK | 27.02.2013 | SM | 27.02.2013 | TR | 27.02.2013 | BG | 27.05.2013 | NO | 27.05.2013 | GR | 28.05.2013 | ES | 07.06.2013 | IS | 27.06.2013 | PT | 27.06.2013 | GB | 03.11.2013 | IE | 03.11.2013 | LU | 03.11.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 03.11.2009 | |
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
MK | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
SM | 27.02.2013 | ||
TR | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
GB | 03.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.11.2013 | ||
LU | 03.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 27.02.2013 | |
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
MK | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
SM | 27.02.2013 | ||
TR | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
GB | 03.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 27.02.2013 | |
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
SM | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
GB | 03.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 27.02.2013 | |
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
GB | 03.11.2013 | ||
IE | 03.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 27.02.2013 | |
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
IE | 03.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 27.02.2013 | |
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 27.02.2013 | |
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
IT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 27.02.2013 | |
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 27.02.2013 | |
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 27.02.2013 | |
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 27.02.2013 | |
HR | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | FI | 27.02.2013 | |
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 27.02.2013 | |
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 27.02.2013 | |
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 27.02.2013 | |
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.02.2013 | |
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
NO | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.02.2013 | |
NO | 27.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003221326 (RAAB SIMON [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10-12 * abstract ** paragraphs [0011] , [0079] , [0084] , [0135] , [0136]; figures 1,38; claim 1 * | by applicant | WO0130545 | DE10048952 |