EP2320702 - Method, mobile communication device and communication system controlling wireless transceiver operation in a dual mode mobile communication device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ekici, Ozgur 12840-4000 Innovation Drive Kanata Ontario, K2K 3K1 / CA | 02 /
Prodanos, Dimitrios 12223 - 4000 Innovation Drive Kanata Ontario, K2K 3K1 / CA | 03 /
Cormier, Jean Philippe Paul 12228 - 4000 Innovation Drive Kanata Ontario, K2K 3K1 / CA | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/33] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/19] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09013860.3 | 04.11.2009 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2320702 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2320702 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16, // H04W48/18, H04W88/06 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP);
H04W48/18 (EP);
H04W88/06 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/19] | H04W48/16, // H04W52/02, H04W48/18, H04W88/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2011/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren, Mobilkommunikationsgerät und Kommunikationssystem zur Steuerung des Betriebes eines drahtlosen Sende-/Empfangsgerätes in diesem Dual Mode Mobilkommunikationsgerät | [2011/19] | English: | Method, mobile communication device and communication system controlling wireless transceiver operation in a dual mode mobile communication device | [2011/19] | French: | Procédé, dispositif de communication mobile et système de communications pour le contrôle d'une opération d'émetteur-récepteur sans fil dans le dispositif de communication mobile dual-mode | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2009 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 01.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15180018.2 / EP3030002 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2009 | AT | 12.08.2015 | BE | 12.08.2015 | BG | 12.08.2015 | CY | 12.08.2015 | CZ | 12.08.2015 | DK | 12.08.2015 | EE | 12.08.2015 | ES | 12.08.2015 | FI | 12.08.2015 | HR | 12.08.2015 | IT | 12.08.2015 | LT | 12.08.2015 | LV | 12.08.2015 | MC | 12.08.2015 | MK | 12.08.2015 | MT | 12.08.2015 | NL | 12.08.2015 | PL | 12.08.2015 | RO | 12.08.2015 | SE | 12.08.2015 | SI | 12.08.2015 | SK | 12.08.2015 | SM | 12.08.2015 | TR | 12.08.2015 | IE | 04.11.2015 | LU | 04.11.2015 | NO | 12.11.2015 | GR | 13.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | IS | 12.12.2015 | PT | 14.12.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 04.11.2009 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
BG | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 04.11.2015 | ||
LU | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 04.11.2015 | ||
LU | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 04.11.2015 | ||
LU | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 04.11.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 12.08.2015 | |
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 12.08.2015 | |
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 12.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006035636 (PIRILA HANNU [FI]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022]; figure 2 *; | [I]WO2009071802 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-5, 7 * * page 2, line 9 - line 14 * * page 3, line 4 - line 18 * * page 5, line 26 - page 9, line 31 * * page 13, line 4 - line 13 * * page 14, line 24 - page 15, line 5 *; | [I]EP0858237 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * page 2, line 3 - line 40 * * page 3, line 1 - line 39; table 1 * * page 3, line 58 - page 5, line 11 *; | [A]WO2009039904 (T MOBILE INT AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 23 - line 31 * * figure 4 * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 17 * * page 7, line 19 - page 9, line 28 *; | [A]US2007021126 (NANDA SANJIV [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraphs [0032] , [0 35] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0056]; figures 3a, 3b *; | [A]WO2009071967 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 4 * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 9 * * page 8, line 16 - page 19, line 7 * | by applicant | US2006035636 |