EP2184862 - Method and system for a combined signal detection for physical layer communication devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2010/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Conway, Bruce 49 Rockrose 92656 Aliso Viejo CA / US | 02 /
Bui, Sang 5 Figaro 92606 Irvine CA / US | 03 /
Wang, Peiqing 208 Kensington Park 92606 Irvine CA / US | 04 /
Powell, Scott 3555 Corte Esperanza 92009 Carlsbad CA / US | 05 /
Tazebay, Mehmet 8 Bayside 92614 Irvine CA / US | [2010/19] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/19] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09013962.7 | 06.11.2009 | [2010/19] | Priority number, date | US20080112951P | 10.11.2008 Original published format: US 112951 P | US20090228253P | 24.07.2009 Original published format: US 228253 P | US20090536172 | 05.08.2009 Original published format: US 536172 | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2184862 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2184862 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/23, H04B3/32, H04B1/707 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
H04B1/7097 (EP,US);
H04B1/12 (US);
H04B3/23 (EP,US);
H04B3/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System für eine kombinierte Signalerkennung für physikalische Kommunikationsvorrichtungen | [2010/19] | English: | Method and system for a combined signal detection for physical layer communication devices | [2010/19] | French: | Procédé et système de détection de signal combiné pour dispositifs de communication de couche physique | [2010/19] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 26.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2009 | AT | 14.08.2013 | BE | 14.08.2013 | BG | 14.08.2013 | CY | 14.08.2013 | CZ | 14.08.2013 | DK | 14.08.2013 | EE | 14.08.2013 | ES | 14.08.2013 | FI | 14.08.2013 | HR | 14.08.2013 | IT | 14.08.2013 | LT | 14.08.2013 | LV | 14.08.2013 | MC | 14.08.2013 | MK | 14.08.2013 | MT | 14.08.2013 | NL | 14.08.2013 | PL | 14.08.2013 | RO | 14.08.2013 | SE | 14.08.2013 | SI | 14.08.2013 | SK | 14.08.2013 | SM | 14.08.2013 | TR | 14.08.2013 | IE | 06.11.2013 | LU | 06.11.2013 | GB | 14.11.2013 | NO | 14.11.2013 | GR | 15.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | FR | 02.12.2013 | IS | 14.12.2013 | PT | 16.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 06.11.2009 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
TR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 06.11.2013 | ||
LU | 06.11.2013 | ||
GB | 14.11.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 02.12.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
TR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 06.11.2013 | ||
GB | 14.11.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 02.12.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 06.11.2013 | ||
GB | 14.11.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 02.12.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 06.11.2013 | ||
GB | 14.11.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 02.12.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
ES | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 14.08.2013 | |
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 14.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4995104 (GITLIN RICHARD D [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 67 - column 5, line 53; figure 2 *; | [X]US2008043888 (BHUKANIA BIJOY [IN], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] ** paragraph [0040] * | Examination | US2005079841 | by applicant | US4995104 | US2005079841 |