EP2145688 - Blood centrifuge with exterior mounted, self-balancing collection chambers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arteriocyte Medical Systems, Inc. 11000 Cedar Avenue, Suite 270 Cleveland, OH 44106 / US | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dolecek, Victor D. 6607 S. Atchinson Way Englewood, CO 80111 / US | 02 /
Malcolm, David 12750 N. 6th Street Parker, CO 80134 / US | 03 /
McIntosh, Kevin D. 9000 Cambridge Ave. N. Brooklyn Park, MN 55443 / US | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | Bridge, Kerry Ann Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Bridge, Kerry Ann Frank B. Dehn & Co. St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09014015.3 | 04.09.2002 | [2010/03] | Priority number, date | US20010961793 | 24.09.2001 Original published format: US 961793 | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2145688 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B04B5/04 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
B04B5/0428 (EP,US);
B04B5/0442 (EP,US);
B04B2005/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | Blutzentrifuge mit aussen angeordneten Sammelkammern mit selbsttätigem Gewichtsausgleich | [2010/03] | English: | Blood centrifuge with exterior mounted, self-balancing collection chambers | [2010/03] | French: | centrifugeuse de sang a chambres de collecte a auto-equilibrage montees a l'exterieur | [2010/03] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 19.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/34] | 06.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02766230.3 / EP1436089 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020766230) is 23.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4113173 (LOLACHI HOUSHANG) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4146172 (CULLIS HERBERT M, et al) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4386613 (LOCSEI ANTHONY A) [A] 1* figures 1-8 *; | [A]US4798579 (PENHASI HARRY A [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6051146 (GREEN TODD CURTIS [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 * | by applicant | US3409203 | US3565330 | US3737096 | US3801142 | US4007871 | US4010894 | US4056224 | US4094461 | USRE29738E | US4108353 | US4109855 | US4109854 | US4303193 | US4387848 | US4889524 | US5316540 | - BORST, H.G. ET AL., J THORAC. CARDIOVASC. SURG., (1982), vol. 84, pages 548 - 553 | - WALTERBUSCH, G. J ET AL., THORAC. CARDIOVASC. SURG., (1982), vol. 30, pages 234 - 23 5 | - WOLNER, F. J ET AL., THORAC. CARDIOVASC. SURG., (1982), vol. 30, pages 236 - 237 |