EP2148334 - Differential flash memory programming technique [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agere Systems Inc. 1247 S. Cedar Crest Boulevard, RM 59-115 Allentown, PA 18103 / US | [2010/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tuchmann, Kenneth A. Wendelsteinstrasse 15 85540 Gronsdorf, Haar / DE | 02 /
Lohse, Martin A. Max-Klinger-Strasse 4 82131 Gauting / DE | [2011/45] |
Former [2010/04] | 01 /
Tuchmann, Kenneth A. Kieslingerstr. 28a 82829 München / DE | ||
02 /
Lohse, Martin A. Schleissheimerstr. 205a 80809 München / DE | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Elisabethenstrasse 11 64283 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Elisabethenstrasse 11 64283 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2010/04] | Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Elisabethenstrasse 11 64283 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 09014173.0 | 29.01.2002 | [2010/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2148334 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2148334 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/10, G06F12/02, // G11C16/34 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
G06F12/0246 (EP,US);
G06F8/654 (EP,US);
G06F8/658 (EP,US);
G11C16/102 (EP,US);
G11C16/105 (EP,US);
G06F2212/7202 (EP,US);
G11C16/349 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | GB [2010/04] | Title | German: | Programmierungstechnik für differentiellen Flash-Speicher | [2010/04] | English: | Differential flash memory programming technique | [2010/04] | French: | Technique de programmation pour une mémoire flash différentielle | [2010/04] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 20.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02002166.3 / EP1331643 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020002166) is 23.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5787484 (NORMAN ROBERT [US]) [X] 1,5,7-10 * abstract * * column 5, line 15 - line 25 * * column 7, line 37 - column 8, line 14 * * column 10, line 14 - line 45 * * column 16, line 57 - column 17, line 9 * [A] 2-4,6; | [A]US5777923 (LEE PETER W [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 6, line 13 - line 20 *; | [A]US4763305 (KUO CLINTON [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |