EP2192022 - Foldable stroller and fold linkage for same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRACO CHILDREN'S PRODUCTS, INC. 3 Glenlake Parkway Atlanta GA 30328 / US | [2010/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahnert, Stephen 136 N. 2nd Street Unit 3C Philadelphia, PA 19106 / US | 02 /
Dean, Roy L. 234 Wilson Street Pottstown, PA 19464 / US | 03 /
Grintz, Joseph T. 141 Maple Flower Road Glenmoore, PA 19343 / US | 04 /
Sorzano, Todd D. 235 High Street Atglen, PA 19310 / US | [2013/01] |
Former [2010/22] | 01 /
Ahnert, Stephen 136 N. 2nd Street Unit 3C Philadelphia, PA 19106 / US | ||
02 /
Dean, Roy L. 234 Wilson Street Pottstown, PA 19464 / US | |||
03 /
Grintz, Joseph T. 141 Maple Flower Road Glenmoore, PA 19343 / US | |||
04 /
Sorzano, Todd D. 235 High Street Atglen, PA 19310 / US | Representative(s) | Metten, Karl-Heinz, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Metten, Karl-Heinz, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/01] | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/22] | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09014320.7 | 17.11.2009 | [2010/22] | Priority number, date | US20080118193P | 26.11.2008 Original published format: US 118193 P | US20090410243 | 24.03.2009 Original published format: US 410243 | US20090610902 | 02.11.2009 Original published format: US 610902 | [2010/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2192022 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2192022 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2192022 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B62B7/08, B62B7/14 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
B62B7/08 (EP,US);
B62B7/142 (EP,US);
B62B2205/003 (EP,US);
B62B2205/22 (EP,US);
B62B7/062 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32418 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/22] | Title | German: | Zusammenklappbarer Kinderwagen und Klappverbindung dafür | [2010/22] | English: | Foldable stroller and fold linkage for same | [2010/22] | French: | Poussette pliable et liaison de pliage pour celle-ci | [2010/22] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 05.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2009 | AT | 02.01.2013 | BE | 02.01.2013 | CY | 02.01.2013 | CZ | 02.01.2013 | DK | 02.01.2013 | EE | 02.01.2013 | FI | 02.01.2013 | HR | 02.01.2013 | IT | 02.01.2013 | LT | 02.01.2013 | LV | 02.01.2013 | MC | 02.01.2013 | MK | 02.01.2013 | MT | 02.01.2013 | NL | 02.01.2013 | PL | 02.01.2013 | RO | 02.01.2013 | SE | 02.01.2013 | SI | 02.01.2013 | SK | 02.01.2013 | SM | 02.01.2013 | TR | 02.01.2013 | BG | 02.04.2013 | NO | 02.04.2013 | GR | 03.04.2013 | ES | 13.04.2013 | IS | 02.05.2013 | PT | 02.05.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 17.11.2009 | |
AT | 02.01.2013 | ||
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
MK | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
SM | 02.01.2013 | ||
TR | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
MK | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
SM | 02.01.2013 | ||
TR | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
SM | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 02.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1647463 (KWAN KWAI WUN TONY [HK]) [X] 1-4,11,12 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1, 4-7 *; | [X]US7077420 (SANTOSKI PAUL [US]) [X] 1-4,11,12 * column 2, line 48 - column 5, line 49; figures 1-14 *; | [XI]EP1900599 (LERADO ZHONG SHAN IND CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-5,9-11 * abstract * [I] 12; | [A]US5709400 (BONNIER MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1647463 | US7077420 | EP1900599 |