EP2322340 - METHOD FOR ACCUMULATING FOIL IN A WELDING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/20] | Method for accumulating foil in a welding process | ||
[2018/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEELEN A/S Morsogade 10 DK-6700 Esbjerg / DK | [2019/09] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states SEELEN A/S Morsogade 10 DK-6700 Esbjerg / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hansen, Henrik Mundbjerg Ostergardsvej 18 7200 Grindsted / DK | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Chas. Hude A/S Langebrogade 3B 1411 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | ||
Former [2012/18] | Nielsen, Leif, et al Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | ||
Former [2011/20] | Sundien, Thomas, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 09014335.5 | 17.11.2009 | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2322340 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2322340 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/02, B65B51/14, B65B51/30, // B29C65/18 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
B29C66/8242 (EP,US);
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C65/7451 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/3432 (EP,US);
B29C66/43 (EP,US);
B29C66/80 (EP,US);
B29C66/81417 (EP,US);
B29C66/81457 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/1122, B29C65/00 (US);
B29C66/849, B29C65/00 (US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] |
Former [2011/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANSAMMELN VON FOLIE IN EINEM SCHWEISSVERFAHREN | [2018/40] | English: | METHOD FOR ACCUMULATING FOIL IN A WELDING PROCESS | [2018/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACCUMULATION DE FEUILLE DANS UN PROCESSUS DE SOUDAGE | [2018/40] |
Former [2011/20] | Verfahren zum Ansammeln von Folie in einem Schweißverfahren | ||
Former [2011/20] | Method for accumulating foil in a welding process | ||
Former [2011/20] | Procédé d'accumulation de feuille dans un processus de soudage | Examination procedure | 04.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 31.01.2012 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 22.03.2012 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 03.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2009 | AT | 27.02.2019 | CY | 27.02.2019 | CZ | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | FI | 27.02.2019 | HR | 27.02.2019 | LT | 27.02.2019 | LV | 27.02.2019 | MC | 27.02.2019 | MK | 27.02.2019 | MT | 27.02.2019 | PL | 27.02.2019 | RO | 27.02.2019 | SI | 27.02.2019 | SK | 27.02.2019 | SM | 27.02.2019 | TR | 27.02.2019 | BG | 27.05.2019 | NO | 27.05.2019 | GR | 28.05.2019 | IS | 27.06.2019 | PT | 27.06.2019 | LU | 17.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 17.11.2009 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
MT | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 17.11.2009 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | CZ | 27.02.2019 | |
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 27.02.2019 | |
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3553059 (STOHLQUIST ROGER H) [X] 1,2,5-8,10 * column 10, lines 58-70; figures 16-19 * * column 1, lines 33-36 *; | [XI]US3287199 (VIRTA NORMAN A) [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * column 5, line 70 - column 6, line 9; figures 3B,4B,5B,6B,7B * * column 6, lines 26-35,55-67 * [I] 8; | [XI]WO9208613 (WELDOTRON DELAWARE INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10 * page 17, paragraph l - page 18, paragraph 1; figures 4,5 * * page 11, lines 31-32; figure 8 * [I] 9; | [X]WO9321001 (DU PONT CANADA [CA]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10 * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 14; figures 1,2 * * page 6, lines 6-7 *; | [X]FR1303894 (M. FEDERICO ROTA) [X] 5,7,9 * figures 1,2 * | Examination | WO8604559 | by applicant | US3553059 | US3287199 | WO9321001 | FR1303894 | WO9208613 |