EP2179821 - Electric hammer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Makita Corporation 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 446-8502 / JP | [2010/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikuta, Hiroki c/o Makita Corporation 3-11-8 Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 446-8502 / JP | 02 /
Aoki, Yonosuke c/o Makita Corporation 3-11-8 Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 446-8502 / JP | [2015/31] |
Former [2010/17] | 01 /
Ikuta, Hiroki c/o Makita Corporation 3-11-8 Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 446-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
Aoki, Yonosuke c/o Makita Corporation 3-11-8 Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 446-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2015/31] |
Former [2010/17] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09014518.6 | 10.04.2006 | [2010/17] | Priority number, date | JP20050114025 | 11.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005114025 | JP20050114026 | 11.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005114026 | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2179821 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2179821 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2179821 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B25D17/24 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
B25D17/24 (EP,US);
B25D2211/003 (EP,US);
B25D2211/068 (EP,US);
B25D2217/008 (EP,US);
B25D2217/0084 (EP,US);
B25D2217/0088 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/31] |
Former [2010/17] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Elektrohammer | [2010/17] | English: | Electric hammer | [2010/17] | French: | Marteau electrique | [2010/17] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 30.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06731516.8 / EP1870209 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060731516) is 25.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01274973 (SHIBAURA ENG WORKS LTD) [A] 1-5,7-9 * abstract *; | [A]JPH01316179 (SHIBAURA ENG WORKS LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2003006051 (SCHMITZER HARALD [DE], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0038] *; | [A]JP2004276185 (MAKITA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2004299036 | JP2004216484 |