EP2197042 - Solar cell having an integral monolithically grown bypass diode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SolAero Technologies Corp. 10420 Research Road SE Albuquerque, NM 87123 / US | [2015/35] |
Former [2010/24] | For all designated states Emcore Solar Power, Inc. 10420 Research Road SE Albuquerque NM 87123 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ho, Frank c/o Emcore Corporation 145 Belmont Drive Sommerset, New Jersey 08873 / US | 02 /
Yeh, Milton, Y. 1454 Princeton Street Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US | 03 /
Chu, Chaw-Long 1436 Rancho Hills Drive Chino Hills, CA 91709 / US | 04 /
Iles, Peter, A. 1000 Park Avenue Arcadia, CA 91007 / US | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | adares Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Reininger & Partner GmbB Tauentzienstraße 7 b/c 10789 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 09014641.6 | 19.05.1999 | [2010/24] | Priority number, date | US19980087206P | 28.05.1998 Original published format: US 87206 P | [2010/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2197042 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2197042 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/068, H01L27/142 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
H01L31/0687 (EP);
H01L27/1421 (EP);
H01L31/0475 (EP);
H01L2224/48137 (EP);
Y02E10/544 (EP);
Y02E10/547 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2010/24] | Title | German: | Solarzellen mit einer integralen monolithisch gewachsenen Bypass-Diode | [2010/24] | English: | Solar cell having an integral monolithically grown bypass diode | [2010/24] | French: | Cellule solaire dotée d'une diode de dérivation à croissance monolithe intégrale | [2010/24] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 28.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/52] | 20.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2018 | 12.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99925702.5 / EP1008188 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990925702) is 07.07.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3912539 (MAGEE VINCENT) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]JPS57204180 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4638109 (ISHIHARA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5009720 (HOKUYO SHIGERU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XY]JPH0964397 (CANON KK) [X] 11-15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-10 |