EP2200293 - Electronic device with a display module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wincor Nixdorf International GmbH Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1 33106 Paderborn / DE | [2017/12] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Wincor Nixdorf International GmbH Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1 33106 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gagla, Mathias Wattstrasse 7 16761 Henningsdorf / DE | 02 /
Kirschke, Uwe Sperberstrasse 4 13505 Berlin / DE | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2017/12] |
Former [2014/46] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2013/51] | Richly, Erik Wincor Nixdorf International GmbH Intellectual Property Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1 33106 Paderborn / DE | Application number, filing date | 09014942.8 | 02.12.2009 | [2010/25] | Priority number, date | DE20081063485 | 17.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008063485 | [2010/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2200293 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2200293 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2200293 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/64 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
H04N5/64 (EP);
H04N21/436 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] |
Former [2010/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Elektronisches Gerät mit einem Anzeigemodul | [2010/25] | English: | Electronic device with a display module | [2010/25] | French: | Appareil électronique doté d'un module d'affichage | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 07.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2009 | CY | 22.03.2017 | CZ | 22.03.2017 | DK | 22.03.2017 | EE | 22.03.2017 | ES | 22.03.2017 | FI | 22.03.2017 | HR | 22.03.2017 | IT | 22.03.2017 | LT | 22.03.2017 | LV | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | MK | 22.03.2017 | MT | 22.03.2017 | NL | 22.03.2017 | PL | 22.03.2017 | RO | 22.03.2017 | SE | 22.03.2017 | SI | 22.03.2017 | SK | 22.03.2017 | SM | 22.03.2017 | TR | 22.03.2017 | BG | 22.06.2017 | NO | 22.06.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | IS | 22.07.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | AT | 02.12.2017 | IE | 02.12.2017 | LU | 02.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MK | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
AT | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
AT | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 02.12.2009 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
AT | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
AT | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
AT | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
IE | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
LU | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.03.2017 | |
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1457982 (IMPRESSIVE IDEAS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2388941 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US7404515 (SHEPLEY STEVEN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008165474 (MCCOY RICHARD A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006146017 (LEUNG PAUL C P [CA] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [IA] - "DVD MULTIMEDIA STATION WITH TOUCH PANEL CONTROL", CLARION PRODUCT CATALOGUE, (20060101), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.clarion.com/us/en/products/2006/multimedia/multimedia_source_units/VRX765VD/us-en-product-pf_1134643389344.html, (20130328), XP055058096 [I] 1-6,9,10,15 * page 1 - page 1 * [A] 7,8,11-14 |