EP2166035 - Olefin polymer compositions and easy-peelable sealants made by using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Du Pont-Mitsui Polychemicals Co., Ltd. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2010/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Masanobu A-501, 5-1 Takasu Urayasu-shi Chiba 2790023 / JP | [2010/23] |
Former [2010/12] | 01 /
Sato, Masanobu 5-1 Takasu Urayasu-shi Chiba 2790023 / JP | Representative(s) | Benson, John Everett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Benson, John Everett J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/12] | Benson, John Everett J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09015302.4 | 08.04.2004 | [2010/12] | Priority number, date | JP20030147662 | 26.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003147662 | [2010/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2166035 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2166035 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2166035 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/10, C08L23/08, C08K5/00 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/08 (KR);
B32B27/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/0815 (KR);
C08L23/0869 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/10 (KR);
B32B2250/24 (EP,US);
B32B2307/306 (EP,US);
B32B2307/31 (EP,US);
B32B2307/748 (EP,US);
B32B2439/70 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2553/00 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/31909 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31928 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0869, C08L2666/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/12] | Title | German: | Olefinpolymerzusammensetzungen und leicht abschälbare Dichtungsmittel daraus | [2010/12] | English: | Olefin polymer compositions and easy-peelable sealants made by using the same | [2010/12] | French: | Compositions de polymère d'oléfine et produits d'étanchéité facilement pelables en l'utilisant | [2010/12] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 21.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04726624.2 / EP1637559 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040726624) is 16.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0934990 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [X] 1,6-7 * the whole document * * paragraph [0021] * [Y] 1,6-7; | [Y]JPS5847038 (MITSUI POLYCHEMICALS LTD) [Y] 1,6-7 * abstract *; | [Y]US2002136891 (KHANDPUR ASHISH K [US], et al) [Y] 1,6-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPS5945343 (MITSUI POLYCHEMICALS LTD) [Y] 1,6-7 * abstract *; | [Y]JPS57195135 (MITSUI POLYCHEMICALS LTD) [Y] 1,6-7 * abstract *; | [Y]JPS6096676 (MITSUI DU PONT POLYCHEMICAL) [Y] 1,6-7 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS6329894 | JPH113895 |