EP2196800 - Method and device for testing a body which conducts electricity by means of ultrasound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VDEh-Betriebsforschungsinstitut GmbH Sohnstrasse 65 40042 Düsseldorf / DE | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oberhoff, Dietmar Ginsterweg 1 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 02 /
Flohr, Guido Ursfelder Strasse 9 50354 Hürth / DE | 03 /
Coen, Günther Paracelsusstr. 90A 42549 Velbert / DE | 04 /
Woeste, Werner Am Sonnenhang 11 40883 Ratingen / DE | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | Tilmann, Max Wilhelm, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 09 46 40509 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Tilmann, Max Wilhelm, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Lohengrinstrasse 11 D-40549 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09015405.5 | 14.12.2009 | [2010/24] | Priority number, date | DE20081061849 | 15.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008061849 | [2010/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2196800 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2196800 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/24, G01N29/26, G01N29/34, G01H11/04 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
G01N29/2412 (EP);
G01H11/04 (EP);
G01N29/262 (EP);
G01N29/343 (EP);
G01N2291/0425 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/24] | G01N29/24, G01N29/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Prüfung eines elektrisch leitfähigen Körpers mittels Ultraschall | [2010/24] | English: | Method and device for testing a body which conducts electricity by means of ultrasound | [2010/24] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de contrôle d'un corps conducteur d'électricité par ultrasons | [2010/24] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 08.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE3511768 (BETR FORSCH INST ANGEW FORSCH [DE]) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * page 4, line 26 - page 8, line 28 * [I] 2-4,12; | [X]DE4133648 (BETR FORSCH INST ANGEW FORSCH [DE]) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * page 3, line 6 - page 5, line 5 *; | [XI] - COEN G., KECK R., LAMPEY H., LUHN E., "Strip testing system < | [X] - K Sawaragi ET AL, "Improvement of SH-wave EMAT phased array inspection by new eight segment probes", Nuclear Engineering and Design 198, (20000101), pages 153 - 163, URL: http://ac.els-cdn.com/S0029549399002769/1-s2.0-S0029549399002769-main.pdf?_tid=73b116c8-79a3-11e2-859c-00000aacb360&acdnat=1361175552_36d8d64957a46934eecdee3269d7fcdc, (20130218), XP055053634 [X] 1 * abstract * * page 153, column r, paragraph 1 - page 155, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0029-5493(99)00276-9 | by applicant | DE4133648 |