EP2206692 - Capsules for concrete from a fiber and ice and method of their production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centrum dopravniho vyzkumu, v.v.i. Lisenska 33a 636 00 BRNO / CZ | [2010/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pospisil, Karel Kainarova 79 616 00 Brno / CZ | [2010/28] | Representative(s) | Malusek, Jiri Kania, Sedlak, Smola Mendlovo namesti 1 a 602 00 Brno / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Malusek, Jiri Kania, Sedlak, Smola Mendlovo namesti 1 a 602 00 Brno / CZ | ||
Former [2010/28] | Malusek, Jiri Kania, Sedlak, Smola Mendlovo namesti 1 a 602 00 Brno / CZ | Application number, filing date | 09015767.8 | 20.12.2009 | [2010/28] | Priority number, date | CZ20080000846 | 29.12.2008 Original published format: CZ 20080846 | CZ20080020728U | 29.12.2008 Original published format: CZ 200820728 U | [2010/28] | Filing language | CS | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2206692 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2206692 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C04B18/02, C04B14/38 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
C04B18/028 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B18/028, C04B16/0633, C04B20/0076, C04B40/0078 (EP);
C04B18/028, C04B20/0048, C04B20/0076, C04B40/0078 (EP) |
Former IPC [2010/28] | C04B14/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/28] | Title | German: | Kapseln für Beton hergestellt aus Fasern und Eis und deren Herstellungsmethode | [2010/28] | English: | Capsules for concrete from a fiber and ice and method of their production | [2010/28] | French: | Capsules pour beton fabriquée de fibres et de glace et leur methode de production | [2010/28] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 13.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2009 | BE | 11.12.2013 | BG | 11.12.2013 | CY | 11.12.2013 | CZ | 11.12.2013 | DK | 11.12.2013 | EE | 11.12.2013 | ES | 11.12.2013 | FI | 11.12.2013 | HR | 11.12.2013 | IT | 11.12.2013 | LT | 11.12.2013 | LV | 11.12.2013 | MC | 11.12.2013 | MK | 11.12.2013 | MT | 11.12.2013 | PL | 11.12.2013 | RO | 11.12.2013 | SE | 11.12.2013 | SI | 11.12.2013 | SM | 11.12.2013 | TR | 11.12.2013 | IE | 20.12.2013 | LU | 20.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | NO | 11.03.2014 | GR | 12.03.2014 | IS | 11.04.2014 | PT | 11.04.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 20.12.2009 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MK | 11.12.2013 | ||
MT | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
TR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/39] | HU | 20.12.2009 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MK | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
TR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HU | 20.12.2009 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MK | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
TR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 20.12.2009 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MK | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
TR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | BE | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MK | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
TR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | BE | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | BE | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | BE | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | BE | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 11.12.2013 | |
NO | 11.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS6414136 (NOZAWA KK) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [I] 3; | [XI]US4830669 (SUZUKI TOSHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 10, line 10 - line 47 * [I] 3; | [A]JPH04209740 (KOA OIL CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2000034803 (TOKYU KENSETSU KK, et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3616589 | CA2547694 | US7285167 | US4565840 | DE2337129 | US7267873 | JPS6414136 | US4860669 |