EP2202600 - Performance monitoring and prognostics for aircraft pneumatic control valves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Embraer S.A. Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima 2170 12227-901 São José Dos Campos SP / BR | [2014/44] |
Former [2014/41] | For all designated states EMBRAER - Empresa Brasileira de Aeronáutica S.A. Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima 2170 12227-901 São José Dos Campos SP / BR | ||
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states EMBRAER - Empresa Brasileira de Aeronáutica S.A. Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima 2170 12227-901 Sao José dos Campos SP / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Do Amaral, Tiago Moraes Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima, 2170 São José dos Campos, 12227-901 / BR | 02 /
Puttini, Lucas Campos Av. Brigadeiro Faria Lima, 2170 São José dos Campos, 12227-901 / BR | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Liesegang, Eva, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/33] | Liesegang, Eva, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/07] | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | Galloway, Peter David, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09015991.4 | 23.12.2009 | [2010/26] | Priority number, date | US20080140357P | 23.12.2008 Original published format: US 140357 P | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2202600 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2202600 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | [2010/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2202600 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2202600 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, B64D45/00, F15B19/00, F16K37/00 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
F16K37/0091 (EP,US);
G05B23/024 (US);
G05B23/0237 (EP);
G05B23/0283 (EP,US);
G05B2219/24077 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25312 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/26] | Title | German: | Überwachung und Prognose für Druckluftsteuerventile eines Flugzeuges | [2010/26] | English: | Performance monitoring and prognostics for aircraft pneumatic control valves | [2010/26] | French: | Surveillance de la performance et prognostique pour vannes de contrôle pneumatiques d'avion | [2014/21] |
Former [2010/26] | Surveillance de la performance et pronostic pour vannes de contrôle pneumatiques d'avion | Examination procedure | 13.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/21] | 01.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.02.2014 | 25.02.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2009 | AT | 08.10.2014 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 08.10.2014 | DK | 08.10.2014 | EE | 08.10.2014 | ES | 08.10.2014 | FI | 08.10.2014 | HR | 08.10.2014 | IT | 08.10.2014 | LT | 08.10.2014 | LV | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | MK | 08.10.2014 | MT | 08.10.2014 | NL | 08.10.2014 | PL | 08.10.2014 | RO | 08.10.2014 | SE | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | SM | 08.10.2014 | TR | 08.10.2014 | IE | 23.12.2014 | LU | 23.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | FR | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | GB | 08.01.2015 | NO | 08.01.2015 | GR | 09.01.2015 | IS | 08.02.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 08.01.2015 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 08.01.2015 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 08.01.2015 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 08.01.2015 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 08.01.2015 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 08.01.2015 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 08.01.2015 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 08.01.2015 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
IE | 23.12.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 23.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
SE | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 08.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0288034 (BOEING CO [US]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 4 * * column 5, line 11 - column 8, line 25 * * column 13, line 56 - column 15, line 11 *; | [I]US3813990 (COPPOLA P, et al) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 33 - column 6, line 5 *; | [X]DE2615345 (LIEBHERR AERA TECHNIK GMBH) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [I]US5616824 (ABDEL-MALEK AIMAN A [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, lines 6-27 * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 26 * * column 4, lines 28-35 * * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 6 *; | [I]US6745107 (MILLER RANDY MARVIN [US]) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 3,10,11 * * column 2, lines 36-56 * * column 6, line 29 - column 9, line 24 * * column 11, line 58 - column 12, line 52 *; | [I]US2008004836 (TEWES MICHAEL J [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0031] *; | [X]US2005114090 (BLACK SCOTT E [US], et al) [X] 9-13 * the whole document *; | [XI]EP1895452 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [X] 14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0043] - [0051] * [I] 9-13; | [I] - BYINGTON C S ET AL, "A model-based approach to prognostics and health management for flight control actuators", AEROSPACE CONFERENCE, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. 2004 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20040306), vol. 6, ISBN 978-0-7803-8155-1, pages 3551 - 3562, XP010748482 [I] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AERO.2004.1368172 | [X] - BLACK S ET AL, "Reconfigurable control and fault identification system", AEROSPACE CONFERENCE, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. 2004 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20040306), ISBN 978-0-7803-8155-1, pages 3481 - 3494, XP010748464 [X] 9-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AERO.2004.1368154 | [I] - BROTHERTON T ET AL, "A testbed for data fusion for engine diagnostics and prognostics", AEROSPACE CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, 2002. IEEE MAR 9-16, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020309), vol. 6, ISBN 978-0-7803-7231-3, pages 3029 - 3042, XP010604872 [I] 9-15 * the whole document * | [I] - XIAODONG ZHANG ET AL, "An integrated approach to bearing fault diagnostics and prognostics", AMERICAN CONTROL CONFERENCE, 2005. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2005 PORTLAND, OR, USA JUNE 8-10, 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE LNKD- DOI:10.1109/ACC.2005.1470385, (20050608), ISBN 978-0-7803-9098-0, pages 2750 - 2755, XP010820213 [I] 9-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACC.2005.1470385 | Examination | EP0743583 |