EP2112866 - Method for heating a container placed on a hob with heating means connected to induction units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Groupe Brandt 89-91 boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2015/22] |
Former [2015/01] | For all designated states FagorBrandt SAS 89-91 boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [2009/44] | For all designated states FagorBrandt SAS 7, rue Henri Becquerel 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gouardo, Didier 120 rue de la Chaise 45520 Cercottes / FR | 02 /
Goumy, Cédric 13, rue Georges Pompidou 45100 Orléans / FR | 03 /
Roux, Alain 101 passage du Corolus 45160 Saint-Hilaire-Saint-Mesmin / FR | [2010/06] |
Former [2009/44] | 01 /
Gouardo, Didier 120 rue de la Chaise 45520 Cercottes / FR | ||
02 /
Goumy, Cédric 14, résidence des Tulipes 66 rue Charles Beauhaire 45140 St Jean de la Ruelle / FR | |||
03 /
Roux, Alain 101 passage du Corolus 45160 Saint-Hilaire-Saint-Mesmin / FR | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/44] | Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09075343.5 | 12.11.2004 | [2009/44] | Priority number, date | FR20030013925 | 27.11.2003 Original published format: FR 0313925 | [2009/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2112866 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2112866 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2112866 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/12, H05B6/06 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
H05B6/065 (EP,US);
H05B2213/03 (EP,US);
H05B2213/05 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/44] | H05B6/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erhitzen eines Behälters, der auf einem Kochherd steht, mit Hilfe von Heizmitteln, die mit Induktoreinheiten funktionieren | [2009/45] | English: | Method for heating a container placed on a hob with heating means connected to induction units | [2009/44] | French: | Procédé de chauffage d'un récipient posé sur une table de cuisson à moyens de chauffage associés à des inducteurs | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/44] | Verfahren zum Erhitzen eines Behälters auf einem Kochherd mit Hilfe von Heizmitteln, die mit Induktoren funktionieren | Examination procedure | 04.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 18.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04805445.6 / EP1688018 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040805445) is 16.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 11.04.2014 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2015/17] | 01.07.2015 | Resumption of proceedings | [2015/19] | 11.04.2014 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2015/19] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.11.2004 | AT | 14.01.2015 | CY | 14.01.2015 | CZ | 14.01.2015 | DK | 14.01.2015 | EE | 14.01.2015 | FI | 14.01.2015 | MC | 14.01.2015 | NL | 14.01.2015 | PL | 14.01.2015 | PT | 14.01.2015 | RO | 14.01.2015 | SE | 14.01.2015 | SI | 14.01.2015 | SK | 14.01.2015 | TR | 14.01.2015 | BG | 14.04.2015 | GR | 15.04.2015 | IS | 14.05.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/40] | HU | 12.11.2004 | |
AT | 14.01.2015 | ||
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/37] | HU | 12.11.2004 | |
AT | 14.01.2015 | ||
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9719298 (ELECTROLUX AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1, line 27 - page 3, line 4 * * page 5, lines 13-19 ** figure 1 *; | [XDAYI]WO9737515 (KUSE KOLJA [DE]) [XD] 1,2,11,12 * abstract * * page 1, lines 9-17 * * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 20 * * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 10 * * page 12, lines 10-21 * * page 13, line 8 - page 14, line 5 * * claims 1,10 * [A] 4-8 [Y] 3 [I] 9,10; | [A]US6350971 (SMOLENSKI JOSEPH LUCIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 3, lines 25-34 * * column 5, lines 7-28 * * column 6, lines 23-36 *; | [XY]EP1206164 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] * * claims 1,2,5 * * figure 2 * [Y] 3 | by applicant | WO9737515 | FR2783370 |