EP2086094 - Permanently excited electric machine for a household appliance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laube, Falk Tuchmacherweg 7 13158 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Skrippek, Jörg Dyrotzer Winkel 1 14641 Wustermark OT Priort / DE | [2009/32] | Application number, filing date | 09100078.6 | 27.01.2009 | [2009/32] | Priority number, date | DE20081007403 | 04.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008007403 | [2009/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2086094 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2086094 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02K21/00, H02K23/00, H02K29/00, D06F37/30, H02P25/18 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
H02P25/18 (EP);
H02K21/046 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/32] | H02K21/00, H02K23/00, H02K29/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/33] |
Former [2009/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Permanentmagneterregte elektrische Maschine für ein Hausgerät | [2009/32] | English: | Permanently excited electric machine for a household appliance | [2009/32] | French: | Machine électrique à excitation permanente pour un appareil ménager | [2009/32] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 19.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007074081 (ARCELIK AS [TR], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP1691479 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,7-11 * paragraphs [0003] , [0028] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1,4-6 *; | [X]DE19782265T (MTS SYSTEM CORP [US]) [X] 1 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 * |