EP2128825 - Toll collection device and method for setting up the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/49] | Toll calculation device and method for setting up same | ||
[2010/42] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
May, Thomas Gruener Platz 7c Wolfenbuettel 38302 / DE | 02 /
Walossek, Erik Marie-Curie-Str. 49 Hildesheim 31139 / DE | [2009/49] | Application number, filing date | 09100274.1 | 08.05.2009 | [2009/49] | Priority number, date | DE20081002071 | 29.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008002071 | [2009/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2128825 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2128825 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G07B15/00 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
G07B15/063 (EP);
G07B15/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/49] | Extension states | AL | 30.11.2012 | BA | 30.11.2012 | RS | 30.11.2012 | Title | German: | Mauterfassungsgerät und Verfahren zum Einrichten eines Mauterfassungsgeräts | [2009/49] | English: | Toll collection device and method for setting up the same | [2010/42] | French: | Appareil de détection de péage et procédé d'agencement d'un appareil de détection de péage | [2009/49] |
Former [2009/49] | Toll calculation device and method for setting up same | Examination procedure | 30.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 14.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/02] | 03.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1870302 (AGES INTERNAT GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0068] * * figure - * [I] 2-10; | [XI]EP1760664 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0073] * * figure - * [I] 2,5-8; | [XI]WO2006050543 (KAPSCH TRAFFICCOM AG [AT]; EBERSTALLER BERND [AT]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 13 * * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 14 * * page 7, line 6 - line 12 * * figure - * [I] 2,4-10 |