EP2078695 - Process for depositing polycrystalline silicon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2009/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hesse, Karl Hechenbergstr. 46 84489 Burghausen / DE | 02 /
Schreieder, Franz Sperberstr. 12 84367 Tann / DE | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Fritz, Helmut, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Fritz, Helmut, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09150271.6 | 09.01.2009 | [2009/29] | Priority number, date | DE20081000052 | 14.01.2008 Original published format: DE102008000052 | [2009/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2078695 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2078695 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2078695 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/035 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
C01B33/035 (EP,US);
C01B33/03 (KR);
C01B33/027 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, NO [2010/17] |
Former [2009/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abscheidung von polykristallinem Silicium | [2009/29] | English: | Process for depositing polycrystalline silicon | [2009/29] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour séparer un produit gazeux d'un flux d'alimentation comprenant des contaminants | [2009/29] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 02.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 23.05.2012 | NO | 23.08.2012 | FR | 31.01.2013 | [2013/50] |
Former [2013/08] | NL | 23.05.2012 | |
NO | 23.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | NO | 23.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2918066 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-11 * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 9 * * page 7, lines 21-29; example 1 *; | [A]EP1264798 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS POLYCRYST [JP]) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0008] *; | [A]WO2005085133 (DEGUSSA [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 4, line 24 - page 7, line 25 *; | [A]RU2004124874 (STEPANOVICH GRIGOR'EVICH VLADIMIROVICH VJACHESLAVOVICH ALEKSANDROVICH) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [PA]WO2008027101 (HEMLOCK SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US], et al) [PA] 1-11 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0013] * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US3933985 | DE2918066 | US4252780 | US4340574 | JPH01188414 | JPH09263405 | WO0212122 | WO02100776 | DE102006009953 | DE102007021003 | - W.C. O MARA; R.B. HERRING; L.P. HUNT, Handbook of Semiconductor Silicon Technology, (1990), page 77 | - Handbook of Semiconductor Silicon Technology, (1990), page 72 |