EP2206523 - Treated cellulosic fibers and absorbent articles made from them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [2010/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weinstein, Barry 419 Bluebird Lane Dresher, PA 19025 / US | [2010/28] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2012/29] |
Former [2010/28] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09150468.8 | 13.01.2009 | [2010/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2206523 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2206523 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/24, C08L25/08, C08L33/02, D06M13/207, D06M15/263, D21H27/00 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
D06M15/263 (EP);
A61L15/28 (EP);
D06M15/3564 (EP);
D21C9/001 (EP);
D21C9/002 (EP);
D21H11/20 (EP);
D06M2200/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, PL [2011/12] |
Former [2010/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Behandelte Cellulosefasern und daraus hergestellte absorbierende Artikel | [2010/28] | English: | Treated cellulosic fibers and absorbent articles made from them | [2010/28] | French: | Fibres cellulosiques traitées et articles absorbants les contenant | [2010/28] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2009 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 11.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.02.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0765174 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,8 * claims 1,6,8 * * page 5, line 40 - line 42 * [Y] 1-3; | [Y]EP1978140 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 2,3 * claim 2 * * page 5, line 14 - line 50 *; | [DY]EP0510831 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [DY] 1 * claims 1-7 *; | [DA]US5137537 (HERRON CARLISLE M [US], et al) [DA] 1,8 * column 5, line 15 - line 51; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0765416 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1,3,4 * | by applicant | US3224926 | US3241553 | US5137537 | US5183707 | US5190563 | EP0765416 | US5549791 | US5294686 | US5447977 | US5256746 | US3440135 | US6436231 | US2006113707 | US7018508 | US6620293 | US7018511 | US3987968 | US4035147 | US3901236 | US5543215 | US5538783 | US5300192 | US5352480 | US5308896 | US5589256 | US5672418 | US2005217809 | US3395708 | US3544862 | US4144122 | US3677886 | US4351699 | US4476323 | US4303471 |