EP2209026 - Apparatus and method for processing at least one optical waveguide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CCS Technology Inc. 103 Foulk Road Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [2010/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kossat, Rainer Hainbach 34 83229, Aschau / DE | 02 /
Heidler, Christian Adlzreiterstr. 5 80337, München / DE | [2010/29] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/29] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09150876.2 | 19.01.2009 | [2010/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2209026 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2209026 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/245, G02B6/25 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
G02B6/25 (EP,US);
G02B6/245 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/29] | G02B5/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2011/13] |
Former [2010/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von mindestens einem optischen Wellenleiter | [2010/29] | English: | Apparatus and method for processing at least one optical waveguide | [2010/29] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour le traitement d'au moins un guide d'ondes optiques | [2010/29] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/09] | 22.01.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 30.10.2013 | IT | 30.10.2013 | [2014/38] |
Former [2014/24] | ES | 30.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1241496 (NETTEST OREGON INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6,10-15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0034] - [0045]; figures 1,2,1A,3A,4A *; | [X]US5253035 (FUKUOKA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9-13 * column 7, line 61 - column 12, line 41; figures 8-27 *; | [A]US2008196450 (HOGARI KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 8 * paragraphs [0056] - [0066]; figures 2-8,13-16 * | by applicant | EP1241496 | US5253035 |