EP2086077 - Fitting system for electric and/or mechanical components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG Klingenbergstrasse 16 32758 Detmold / DE | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bury, Joachim Elverdisser Str. 27 32052 Herford / DE | 02 /
Schulze, Rainer Wellnerweg 4 32760 Detmold / DE | 03 /
Salomon, Thomas Hermann-Vogelsang-Str. 16 33330 Gütersloh / DE | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 09150914.1 | 20.01.2009 | [2009/32] | Priority number, date | DE20082001538U | 02.02.2008 Original published format: DE 202008001538 U | DE20082001600U | 04.02.2008 Original published format: DE 202008001600 U | DE20082015309U | 19.11.2008 Original published format: DE 202008015309 U | [2009/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2086077 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2086077 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/21, H02G5/02 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
H02B1/21 (EP,US);
H02G5/025 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/32] | H02B1/052 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2014/14] |
Former [2009/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Montagesystem für elektrische und/oder mechanische Komponenten | [2009/32] | English: | Fitting system for electric and/or mechanical components | [2009/32] | French: | Système de montage pour composants électriques et/ou mécaniques | [2009/32] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/33] | 06.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0336294 (LOH KG RITTAL WERK [DE]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0524084 (DELACHAUX SA [FR]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [X]US6274817 (JAAKKOLA RISTO [FI], et al) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2376771 (DELACHAUX C [FR]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2438359 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1443617 | DE19859716 |